Ost v. Spin the Planet, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Christine Ost
Defendant: WTE, Inc., STP JJ Team I, LLC, d/b/a Spin the Planet Enterprises, d/b/a Jimmy John's, Spin the Planet, Inc. and Daniel Vansteenberg
Case Number: 1:2019cv11720
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 24 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Amended Pleadings due by 10/25/2019. Fact Discovery to be completed by 9/30/2020. Class certification Motions due by 10/30/2020. Responses due by 11/30/2020. Status Conference set for 3/16/2020 02:45 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria)
September 18, 2019 Filing 23 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Scheduling Conference held on 9/18/2019; Counsel state the status of the case. Plaintiff discusses pizza delivery charges they allege were not received. The court discusses the case jurisdiction and the proposed case schedule. The court will adopt the schedule as an order of the court and sets a status conference for 5/16/19 at 2:45pm. Counsel may attend this conference by phone by calling into the courts conference line at 888-675-2535 access code 9123576 at the time of the hearing., ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/25/2019., Discovery to be completed by 9/30/2020), ( Status Conference set for 3/16/2020 02:45 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin.). (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com.) (Simeone, Maria)
September 18, 2019 Filing 22 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael J. Lingle, Annette M. Gifford, and Adam T. Sanderson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 17, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE: Counsel may appear at the scheduling conference set for 2:30pm on 9/18/19 by phone by calling into the courts conference line at 888-675-2535 access code 9123576. re #19 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference (Simeone, Maria)
September 16, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Rucki, Ryan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 19 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Rucki, Ryan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Gordon, Philip)
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael J. Lingle, Esq., Annette M. Gifford, Esq. and Adam T. Sanderson, Esq. Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-7875713 by Christine Ost. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gordon, Philip)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Statement. Joint Statement pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d) due by 9/16/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to September 16, 2019 to Submit Local Rule 16.1(d) Joint Statement by STP JJ Team I, LLC, d/b/a Spin the Planet Enterprises, d/b/a Jimmy John's, Spin the Planet, Inc., Daniel Vansteenberg, WTE, Inc..(Rucki, Ryan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 #13 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joseph M. Sokolowski and Emily A. Unger. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Emily A. Unger Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7853305 by STP JJ Team I, LLC, d/b/a Spin the Planet Enterprises, d/b/a Jimmy John's, Spin the Planet, Inc., Daniel Vansteenberg, WTE, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rucki, Ryan)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joseph M. Sokolowski Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7853267 by STP JJ Team I, LLC, d/b/a Spin the Planet Enterprises, d/b/a Jimmy John's, Spin the Planet, Inc., Daniel Vansteenberg, WTE, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rucki, Ryan)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 STATE COURT Record. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling Conference has been set for 9/18/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling order sample, #2 standing order on summary judgment)(Simeone, Maria)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Rucki, Ryan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Torres on behalf of STP JJ Team I, LLC, d/b/a Spin the Planet Enterprises, d/b/a Jimmy John's, Spin the Planet, Inc., Daniel Vansteenberg, WTE, Inc. (Torres, Steven)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Since this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, Defendants' counsel is reminded that a notification form indicating whether or not the parties have consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge has not been filed. Submission of the form is mandatory and a completed form should be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by STP JJ Team I, LLC, d/b/a Spin the Planet Enterprises, d/b/a Jimmy John's, Spin the Planet, Inc., Daniel Vansteenberg, WTE, Inc..(Rucki, Ryan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STP JJ Team I, LLC, d/b/a Spin the Planet Enterprises, d/b/a Jimmy John's, Spin the Planet, Inc., Daniel Vansteenberg, WTE, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7823639 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rucki, Ryan) (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/9/2019) (DeMaria, Timothy). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #4 Local Category Form) (DeMaria, Timothy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ost v. Spin the Planet, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WTE, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Rucki
Represented By: Emily A. Unger
Represented By: Steven J. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STP JJ Team I, LLC, d/b/a Spin the Planet Enterprises, d/b/a Jimmy John's
Represented By: Ryan A. Rucki
Represented By: Emily A. Unger
Represented By: Steven J. Torres
Represented By: Joseph M. Sokolowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spin the Planet, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Rucki
Represented By: Emily A. Unger
Represented By: Steven J. Torres
Represented By: Joseph M. Sokolowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Vansteenberg
Represented By: Ryan A. Rucki
Represented By: Emily A. Unger
Represented By: Steven J. Torres
Represented By: Joseph M. Sokolowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Ost
Represented By: Adam T. Sanderson
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Philip J. Gordon
Represented By: Annette M. Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?