Roberts v. Judgment Acquisitions Unlimited et al
Plaintiff: Mark Roberts
Defendant: Champion Funding Inc. and Judgment Acquisitions Unlimited
Case Number: 1:2019cv11722
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mark Roberts. (Davidson, James)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Davidson on behalf of Mark Roberts (Davidson, James)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike #8 Answer to Complaint, #7 Answer to Complaint by Mark Roberts.(Davidson, James)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added James L. Davidson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James L. Davidson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7872009 by Mark Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James L. Davidson)(Crick, Kevin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Judgment Acquisitions Unlimited.(Paine, Matthew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Champion Funding Inc..(Paine, Matthew)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Champion Funding Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Crick, Kevin)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Judgment Acquisitions Unlimited served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Crick, Kevin)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Champion Funding Inc., Judgment Acquisitions Unlimited. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 FILED in ERROR Modified on 8/9/2019 (McDonagh, Christina).
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Roberts, Champion Funding Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7823842 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Mark Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit June 19, 2019 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Crick, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Judgment Acquisitions Unlimited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion Funding Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judgment Acquisitions Unlimited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Roberts
Represented By: Kevin V.K. Crick
Represented By: James L. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?