Tyger Manufacturing LLC v. Jacobs
Plaintiff: Tyger Manufacturing LLC
Defendant: Timothy M. Jacobs
Case Number: 1:2019cv11732
Filed: August 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Tyger Manufacturing LLC re #13 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #15 Proposed Document(s) submitted, #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Timothy M. Jacobs d/b/a/ The Glass Blunt Store and/or The G.B.S., #14 Affidavit in Support of Motion . (Fox, Steven)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Tyger Manufacturing LLC. Document received: Proposed Default Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Fox, Steven)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Steven N. Fox in Support re #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Timothy M. Jacobs d/b/a/ The Glass Blunt Store and/or The G.B.S. filed by Tyger Manufacturing LLC. (Fox, Steven)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Jeffrey Han in Support re #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Timothy M. Jacobs d/b/a/ The Glass Blunt Store and/or The G.B.S. filed by Tyger Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Fox, Steven)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Timothy M. Jacobs d/b/a/ The Glass Blunt Store and/or The G.B.S. filed by Tyger Manufacturing LLC. (Fox, Steven)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Timothy M. Jacobs d/b/a/ The Glass Blunt Store and/or The G.B.S. by Tyger Manufacturing LLC.(Fox, Steven)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 Return receipt received for mail sent to Timothy M. Jacobs Delivered on 9/12/2019 (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment re #8 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Timothy M. Jacobs. (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Request for notice of default by Tyger Manufacturing LLC . (Fox, Steven)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Tyger Manufacturing LLC. Timothy M. Jacobs served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Tyger Manufacturing LLC. (Fox, Steven)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tyger Manufacturing LLC. (Fox, Steven)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically shall download this summons, complete one for each defendant, and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DeMaria, Timothy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
August 11, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case. (Fox, Steven)
August 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy M. Jacobs Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7825972 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Tyger Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Local Category Form, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F) (Fox, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyger Manufacturing LLC v. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyger Manufacturing LLC
Represented By: Steven N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy M. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?