Berthiaume v. Tradz, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Adam Berthiaume
Defendant: Wells Fargo Auto and Tradz, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11741
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Auto identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Auto.. (Higgins, Sean)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Answer having been filed in this consumer protection case, the court enters the following pretrial schedule:Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be completed by 10/18/19; Motions for leave to Amend Pleadings & Joinder of Parties are due by 11/15/19. Without leave of court, the parties are permitted to serve 30 interrogatories, 30 requests for admissions and 30 document requests, to be filed within the 30 days of the initial disclosures, and expects responses to be made in thirty days, unless a request for additional time is granted. A party may not notice more than 3 deponents without leave of court on a showing of good cause. If all parties are interested in the courts mediation program, they must notify our docket clerk Arnold Pacho (617-748-9812) by 12/2/19 (or earlier). All fact discovery must be completed no later than 1/20/20. Summary judgment motions are due by 2/10/20, with Oppositions due by 3/2/20; Reply, if any, by leave of court. Defendant may file a dispositive motion on inadequately pleaded claims (for example, there is no state actor named as a defendant in this case to support civil rights claims - Count IV and Count V) prior to the close of discovery.(Zierk, Marsha)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Tradz, LLC.(Saloman, Syd)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wells Fargo Auto.(Higgins, Sean)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 24, 2019 to Respond to Complaint. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 24, 2019 to Respond to Complaint by Wells Fargo Auto.(Brodsky, Jack)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Adam Berthiaume. Wells Fargo Auto served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Adam Berthiaume. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking, #3 Exhibit Signed Return Receipt)(Korth, Sebastian)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Adam Berthiaume. Tradz, LLC served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Adam Berthiaume. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit Service Reciept, #3 Exhibit USPS Tracking, #4 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Korth, Sebastian)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7829360 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Adam Berthiaume. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Category Sheet)(Korth, Sebastian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berthiaume v. Tradz, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Auto
Represented By: Jack S. Brodsky
Represented By: Sean R. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradz, LLC
Represented By: Syd A. Saloman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Berthiaume
Represented By: Sebastian N. Korth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?