Auctus Fund, LLC v. Optec International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Auctus Fund, LLC
Defendant: Optec International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11751
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment re #14 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default. (Lara, Miguel)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Optec International, Inc. (Lara, Miguel)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: Motion Hearing held on 9/19/2019 re #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #7 Emergency MOTION for Writ of Garnishment #4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite on a Short Order of Notice, wi filed by Auctus Fund, LLC...Plaintiff counsel appeared, no one appeared on behalf of the defendant. ORDERED: Supplemental materials to be filed on or before 9/27/19; All Motions taken under advisement.(Atty Giordano for Plaintiff) (Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.) (Molloy, Maryellen)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 Request for notice of default by Auctus Fund, LLC Pursuant to Rule 55(a), with a Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Philip M. Giordano, #2 Exhibit A)(Giordano, Philip)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on a Short Order of Notice, to Enjoin Termination of SEC Registration and Compel Conversions Into Public Shares, with Certificate of Service : Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Lara, Miguel)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Auctus Fund, LLC. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Giordano, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 Exhibit B to Giordano Affidavit - Corrected Errata by Auctus Fund, LLC to #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on a Short Order of Notice, to Enjoin Termination of SEC Registration and Compel Conversions Into PUblic Shares, with Certificate of Service . (Giordano, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on a Short Order of Notice, to Enjoin Termination of SEC Registration and Compel Conversions Into PUblic Shares, with Certificate of Service, #7 Emergency MOTION for Writ of Garnishment on a Short Order of Notice for Attachment of Defendant's Assets, with Certificate of Service, #4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite on a Short Order of Notice, with Certificate of Service with Certificate of Service filed by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Giordano, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 Emergency MOTION for Writ of Garnishment on a Short Order of Notice for Attachment of Defendant's Assets, with Certificate of Service by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Attachment of Defendants' Assets)(Giordano, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on a Short Order of Notice, to Enjoin Termination of SEC Registration and Compel Conversions Into PUblic Shares, with Certificate of Service, #4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite on a Short Order of Notice, with Certificate of Service with Certificate of Service filed by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Giordano, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on a Short Order of Notice, to Enjoin Termination of SEC Registration and Compel Conversions Into PUblic Shares, with Certificate of Service by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Louis Posner, #2 Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit 1B, #4 Exhibit 1C, #5 Affidavit of Philip M. Giordano, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit J, #16 Exhibit K, #17 Exhibit L, #18 Text of Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction)(Giordano, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite on a Short Order of Notice, with Certificate of Service by Auctus Fund, LLC.(Giordano, Philip)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Optec International, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7832208 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 1C, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 JS45 Category Sheet)(Giordano, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auctus Fund, LLC v. Optec International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auctus Fund, LLC
Represented By: Philip M. Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optec International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?