Matsumoto v. The Endurance International Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shoichi Matsumoto
Defendant: The Endurance International Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11753
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Endurance International Group, Inc., filed by Shoichi Matsumoto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - sample of original images, #2 Exhibit B - registration certificates, #3 Exhibit C - sample screenshots)(Parker, Robert)
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Endurance International Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endurance International Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent EIG Investors Corp. for The Endurance International Group, Inc... (Loh, David)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by David Y. Loh on behalf of The Endurance International Group, Inc.. (Loh, David)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Judicial Notice by The Endurance International Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I)(Loh, David)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by The Endurance International Group, Inc. to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. (Loh, David)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by The Endurance International Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loh, David)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David Y. Loh on behalf of The Endurance International Group, Inc. (Loh, David)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by The Endurance International Group, Inc.. (Loh, David)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed The Endurance International Group, Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Parker, Robert)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to The Endurance International Group, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Parker, Robert)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(Parker, Robert)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against The Endurance International Group, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7833143 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Shoichi Matsumoto. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Form)(Parker, Robert) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/15/2019) (Pacho, Arnold). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2019: #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matsumoto v. The Endurance International Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shoichi Matsumoto
Represented By: Robert Terry Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Endurance International Group, Inc.
Represented By: David Y. Loh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?