Chomo v. CWABS Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-15
Plaintiff: Philip R. Chomo
Defendant: CWABS Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-15
Case Number: 1:2019cv11754
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Strike #28 Affidavit of Donald P. Rosendale by CWABS Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-15.(Carr, Peter)
February 3, 2020 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
January 31, 2020 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Donald P. Rosendale by Philip R. Chomo. (McKillop, Matthew)
January 31, 2020 Filing 27 Opposition re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Philip R. Chomo. (McKillop, Matthew)
January 10, 2020 Filing 26 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss to 1/31/20 (Hourihan, Lisa)
January 8, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to #23 Motion to Dismiss by Philip R. Chomo.(McKillop, Matthew)
December 23, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CWABS Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-15. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Carr, Peter)
December 23, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CWABS Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-15.(Carr, Peter)
December 3, 2019 Filing 22 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to 12/23/19 (Hourihan, Lisa)
December 2, 2019 Filing 21 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 23, 2019 to File Responsive Pleading by CWABS Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-15.(Carr, Peter)
November 25, 2019 Filing 20 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying as moot #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in light of the amended complaint, D. 19. (Hourihan, Lisa)
November 15, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CWABS Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-15, filed by Philip R. Chomo.(McKillop, Matthew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss to 11/15/19 (Hourihan, Lisa)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Response by Philip R. Chomo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McKillop, Matthew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CWABS Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-15. (Carr, Peter)
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CWABS Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-15.(Carr, Peter)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to 10/18/19 to File Responsive Pleading. (Hourihan, Lisa)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 18, 2019 to File Responsive Pleading by CWABS Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-15.(Carr, Peter)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by John H. McCann, III (McCann, John)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Francis Carr, II on behalf of CWABS Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-15 (Carr, Peter)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 Withdrawal of motion: #8 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Philip R. Chomo.. (McKillop, Matthew)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Philip R. Chomo in Support re #8 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Philip R. Chomo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Donald Rosendale, #2 Exhibits A-D)(McKillop, Matthew)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave by Philip R. Chomo.(McKillop, Matthew)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive pleading to 10/1/19 (Hourihan, Lisa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Assented Motion for Extension of time to File Response to #1 Complaint by CWABS Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-15.(McCann, John)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CWABS Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-15. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee/payment: $400.00, receipt number 1BST075938 for #1 Complaint (Coppola, Katelyn)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Judge Casper from Philip R. Chomo. (Currie, Haley)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CWABS Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-15, filed by Philip R. Chomo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet)(Currie, Haley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chomo v. CWABS Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip R. Chomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWABS Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-15
Represented By: Peter Francis Carr, II
Represented By: John H. McCann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?