Murphy et al v. Juul Labs, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marianne Savage, Cade Beauparlant and Matthew Murphy
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11755
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Juul Labs, Inc. re 5 Order on Motion to Stay Joint Notice of JPML Determination (Attachments: #1 JPML's Transfer Order)(Francisco, Ana)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #4 Assented to MOTION to Stay. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Determination by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Determination)(Francisco, Ana)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Juul Labs, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Juul Labs, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7833834 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Matthew Murphy, Marianne Savage, Cade Beauparlant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Sheet)(Gottlieb, Mark) Modified on 8/15/2019 to correct docket text description (Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy et al v. Juul Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Ana M. Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Savage
Represented By: Mark A. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cade Beauparlant
Represented By: Mark A. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Murphy
Represented By: Mark A. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?