Chiminello v. Action Collection Agencies, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Chiminello
Defendant: Action Collection Agencies, Inc. d/b/a Action Collection Agency of Boston and Action Collection Agencies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11769
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Action Collection Agencies, Inc..(O'Connor, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion to Set Aside Default #9 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Action Collection Agencies, Inc. (Simeone, Maria)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 Return receipt received for certified mail (#4364) re. #9 sent to Action Collection Agency, Inc. d/b/a Action re. Collection Agency of Boston: Delivered on 9/30/2019 (Montes, Mariliz)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION to Set Aside Default (Remove) by Action Collection Agencies, Inc..(O'Connor, John)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Action Collection Agencies, Inc. A Copy of this Notice has been mailed to the Defendant, via first class and certified mail (#7004 1160 0001 5659 4364). (Attachments: #1 Default Standing Order)(Montes, Mariliz) (Main Document 9 replaced on 9/23/2019) (Montes, Mariliz). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/23/2019) (Montes, Mariliz).
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Entry of Default (Montes, Mariliz)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by David Chiminello. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default by David Chiminello. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kimmel, Craig) Modified on 9/23/2019 to detach memorandum and re=docket as a new entry. (Montes, Mariliz).
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Action Collection Agencies, Inc. served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Kimmel, Craig)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 11/18/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Action Collection Agencies, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Action Collection Agencies, Inc. d/b/a Action Collection Agency of Boston Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7836379 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by David Chiminello. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category W-9 Form, #3 Summons)(Kimmel, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chiminello v. Action Collection Agencies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Collection Agencies, Inc. d/b/a Action Collection Agency of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Collection Agencies, Inc.
Represented By: John J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Chiminello
Represented By: Craig Thor Kimmel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?