CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Advanced Warehouses, Inc.
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Defendant: Advanced Warehouses, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11770
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 16, 2019 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. (Paine, Matthew)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 16, 2019 to File Answer by Advanced Warehouses, Inc..(Conroy, Daniel)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 9, 2019 to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading. (Paine, Matthew)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 9, 2019 to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Advanced Warehouses, Inc..(Conroy, Daniel)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Advanced Warehouses, Inc.. (Conroy, Daniel)
September 14, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. Advanced Warehouses, Inc. served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. Acknowledgement filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Corson, Brett)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Paine, Matthew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Advanced Warehouses, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Complaint, Corrected Version of Category Sheet Only by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Corson, Brett)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Advanced Warehouses, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7836409 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Corson, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Advanced Warehouses, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Warehouses, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel H. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Brett R. Corson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?