PMG Resources LLC. v. Martinez Ramos et al
Plaintiff: PMG Resources LLC.
Defendant: Jose Martinez Ramos and Noemi Martinez
Case Number: 1:2019cv11771
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2019 02:45 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) is responsible for ensuring that all parties and/or their attorneys who have not filed an answer or appearance with the court are notified of the date of the scheduling conference. (MacDonald, Gail)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Currie, Haley)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria B. Lynn on behalf of PMG Resources LLC. (Lynn, Alexandria)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jose Martinez Ramos, Noemi Martinez, filed by PMG Resources LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet., #2 Category Sheet )(Lynn, Alexandria) Modified to fix docket text on 8/19/2019 (Currie, Haley). Modified to separate AO121 into own entry on 8/19/2019 (Currie, Haley).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PMG Resources LLC. v. Martinez Ramos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PMG Resources LLC.
Represented By: Alexandria B. Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Martinez Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noemi Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?