USI INSURANCE SERVICES, LLC v. BARK et al
Plaintiff: USI Insurance Services LLC.
Defendant: BRIAN D. BARK and Brown & Brown Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11810
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 44 Defendant Brown & Brown, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Brown & Brown Inc..(Bosworth, Brian)
October 8, 2019 Filing 43 Defendant Brian D. Bark's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BRIAN D. BARK.(Bosworth, Brian)
October 4, 2019 Filing 42 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2019. Discovery to be completed by 2/5/2020 Motions due by 6/1/2020(MacDonald, Gail)
September 23, 2019 Filing 41 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Scheduling Conference held on 9/23/2019. Case called. Court had colloquy with counsel. Parties to jointly report to clerk any request for ADR or Consent to Magistrate. Scheduling Order to follow. Status Conference set for 2/6/2020 02:15 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (Court Reporter: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Hermanson, Mooney, Bosworth, Perry) (MacDonald, Gail)
September 20, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE Resetting a Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. PLEASE NOTE EARLIER TIME. (MacDonald, Gail)
September 20, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B Hermanson on behalf of USI Insurance Services LLC. (Hermanson, Eric)
September 17, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3) by BRIAN D. BARK.(Bosworth, Brian)
September 17, 2019 Filing 37 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3) by Brown & Brown Inc..(Bosworth, Brian)
September 16, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3). (BARBERA, VINCENT)
September 16, 2019 Filing 35 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (BARBERA, VINCENT)
September 4, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Brian J. Bosworth Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Attorneys Michael D. O'Mara and Joseph W. Catuzzi of Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP (Bosworth, Brian)
September 4, 2019 Filing 33 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ADOPTING the parties Joint Proposed Scheduling Order [32-1], DENYING as MOOT Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Conduct Expedited Discovery #27 , and cancelling the motion hearing scheduled for today. (MacDonald, Gail)
September 3, 2019 Filing 32 Joint RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION to Expedite - Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery Joint Response and Resolution to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery filed by BRIAN D. BARK, Brown & Brown Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bosworth, Brian)
September 3, 2019 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USI Insurance Services LLC.. Brown & Brown Inc. waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (BARBERA, VINCENT)
September 3, 2019 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USI Insurance Services LLC.. BRIAN D. BARK waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (BARBERA, VINCENT)
August 30, 2019 Filing 29 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Hearing set for 9/4/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail) Modified on 9/4/2019 (MacDonald, Gail).
August 29, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION to Expedite - Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery filed by USI Insurance Services LLC.. (Chaffin, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Expedite - Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery by USI Insurance Services LLC..(Chaffin, David)
August 28, 2019 Filing 26 Recommendations for Scheduling Order Proposed by Defendants. (Bosworth, Brian)
August 28, 2019 Filing 25 Recommendations for Scheduling Order Proposed by Plaintiff USI Insurance Services, LLC Pursuant to August 26, 2019 Order. (Chaffin, David)
August 27, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 03:15 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
August 27, 2019 Filing 23 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 26, 2019 Filing 22 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Please see attached order. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 26, 2019 Filing 21 EXHIBIT re #20 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Peter J. Mooney and Vincent N. Barbera Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7849037 by USI Insurance Services LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Fuller, R.)
August 26, 2019 Filing 20 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Peter J. Mooney and Vincent N. Barbera Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7849037 by USI Insurance Services LLC..(Fuller, R.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Victoria Fuller on behalf of USI Insurance Services LLC. (Fuller, R.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Chaffin on behalf of USI Insurance Services LLC. (Chaffin, David)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Bosworth on behalf of BRIAN D. BARK, Brown & Brown Inc. (Bosworth, Brian)
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Perry on behalf of BRIAN D. BARK, Brown & Brown Inc. (Perry, Michael)
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-03618.
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE UNTIED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF MASSACHUSETTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 8/23/2019. 8/23/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay filed by BRIAN D. BARK, BROWN & BROWN, INC..Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.(CATUZZI, JOSEPH)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Transfer to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts and to Dismiss or Transfer for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by BRIAN D. BARK, BROWN & BROWN, INC..Memorandum of Law, Declaration, Certificate of Service.(CATUZZI, JOSEPH)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian J. Bosworth by BRIAN D. BARK, BROWN & BROWN, INC.. (Filing fee $ 40.). (CATUZZI, JOSEPH)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL D. O'MARA on behalf of BRIAN D. BARK, BROWN & BROWN, INC. (O'MARA, MICHAEL)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 (FEE RECEIVED 8/22/2019) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michael R. Perry (Filing fee $ 40.) filed by BRIAN D. BARK, BROWN & BROWN, INC..Pro Hac Vice Application.(CATUZZI, JOSEPH) Modified on 8/23/2019 (amas).
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 (FEE RECEIVED 8/22/2019) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Brian J. Bosworth (Filing fee $ 40.) filed by BRIAN D. BARK, BROWN & BROWN, INC..Pro Hac Vice Application.(CATUZZI, JOSEPH) Modified on 8/23/2019 (amas).
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH WILLIAM CATUZZI on behalf of BRIAN D. BARK, BROWN & BROWN, INC. (CATUZZI, JOSEPH)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON FRIDAY, AUGUST 23, 2019, AT 10:00 A.M. BEFORE THE HON. CHAD F. KENNEY, IN COURTROOM 6A, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT COUNSEL SHALL MEET AND CONFER REGARDING A PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER ADVANCING THE MATTER UP TO AND INCLUDING A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING. PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE DEFENDANTS PERSONALLY SERVED WITH A COPY OF THIS ORDER UNLESS DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL ACCEPTS SERVICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 8/19/2019. 8/19/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sme, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER J. MOONEY on behalf of USI INSURANCE SERVICES, LLC (MOONEY, PETER)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent USI, INC., Corporate Parent USI GUARANTOR, INC., Corporate Parent USI ADVANTAGE CORP., Corporate Parent KKR& CO, L.P. for USI INSURANCE SERVICES, LLC. by USI INSURANCE SERVICES, LLC.(ahf)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY USI INSURANCE SERVICES, LLC.MEMORANDUM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ahf)
August 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to BRIAN D. BARK, BROWN & BROWN, INC.. 2 Given To: Counsel on 8/9/2019 (ahf)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRIAN D. BARK, BROWN & BROWN, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 201905.), filed by USI INSURANCE SERVICES, LLC.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USI INSURANCE SERVICES, LLC v. BARK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USI Insurance Services LLC.
Represented By: PETER J. MOONEY
Represented By: David B. Chaffin
Represented By: R. Victoria Fuller
Represented By: VINCENT N. BARBERA
Represented By: Eric B Hermanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN D. BARK
Represented By: Brian J. Bosworth
Represented By: JOSEPH WILLIAM CATUZZI
Represented By: MICHAEL D. O'MARA
Represented By: Michael R. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown & Brown Inc.
Represented By: Brian J. Bosworth
Represented By: JOSEPH WILLIAM CATUZZI
Represented By: MICHAEL D. O'MARA
Represented By: Michael R. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?