Burns v. Broder Blackinton LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Cortney Burns
Defendant: Blackinton Backwoods LLC, Blackinton Mill LLC, Dana Nielsen, 1288 Mass Ave LLC, Ben Svenson, Broder Blackinton LLC, The Beyond Place LLC, Eric Svenson and Blackinton Operating LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11838
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 49 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
August 28, 2019 Filing 48 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-01209.
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING #27 MOTION TO TRANSFER. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/5/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., VACATING both the August 8, 2019 hearing on Defendants' #27 motion and the initial case management conference. Defendants' #27 motion is taken under submission on the papers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 45 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by 1288 Mass Ave LLC, Blackinton Backwoods LLC, Blackinton Mill LLC, Blackinton Operating LLC, Broder Blackinton LLC, Dana Nielsen, Ben Svenson, Eric Svenson, The Beyond Place LLC. and Cortney Burns (O'Connell, Liam) (Filed on 8/1/2019) Modified on 8/2/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2019 Filing 44 Certificate of Interested Entities by 1288 Mass Ave LLC, Blackinton Backwoods LLC, Blackinton Mill LLC, Blackinton Operating LLC, Broder Blackinton LLC, Dana Nielsen, Ben Svenson, Eric Svenson, The Beyond Place LLC identifying Other Affiliate Blackinton Partners LLC for 1288 Mass Ave LLC, Blackinton Backwoods LLC, Blackinton Mill LLC, Blackinton Operating LLC, The Beyond Place LLC. (Fox, Emily) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 43 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (O'Connell, Liam) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 42 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Cortney Burns filed by Cortney Burns. (Xifo, Natalie) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 41 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Xifo, Natalie) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 40 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 12, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials HSG immediately after the case number and that the Oakland Division is correctly reflected as the Court's location, not San Francisco. No further action is necessary. Re: #39 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed by 1288 Mass Ave LLC, Broder Blackinton LLC, Eric Svenson, Blackinton Backwoods LLC, Dana Nielsen, Ben Svenson, Blackinton Operating LLC, The Beyond Place LLC, Blackinton Mill LLC (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY (re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , for Failure to State a Claim, or, in the alternative, to Transfer Venue to the District of Massachusetts ) filed by1288 Mass Ave LLC, Blackinton Backwoods LLC, Blackinton Mill LLC, Blackinton Operating LLC, Broder Blackinton LLC, Dana Nielsen, Ben Svenson, Eric Svenson, The Beyond Place LLC. (Fox, Emily) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 38 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , for Failure to State a Claim, or, in the alternative, to Transfer Venue to the District of Massachusetts ) filed byCortney Burns. (Xifo, Natalie) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Fox, Emily. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to O'Connell, Liam.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Emily Grannon Fox ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13473038.) filed by 1288 Mass Ave LLC, Blackinton Backwoods LLC, Blackinton Mill LLC, Blackinton Operating LLC, Broder Blackinton LLC, Dana Nielsen, Ben Svenson, Eric Svenson, The Beyond Place LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Fox, Emily) (Filed on 6/27/2019) Modified on 6/28/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Liam T. O'Connell ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13473023.) filed by 1288 Mass Ave LLC, Blackinton Backwoods LLC, Blackinton Mill LLC, Blackinton Operating LLC, Broder Blackinton LLC, Dana Nielsen, Ben Svenson, Eric Svenson, The Beyond Place LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(O'Connell, Liam) (Filed on 6/27/2019) Modified on 6/28/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2019 Reset Deadlines/Hearings, See Docket No. 33 : Responses due by 6/27/2019; Replies due by 7/11/2019; Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2019; #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Hearing/ Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. regarding Docket Number 31, SETTING the following deadlines: (1) responses to #27 motion to dismiss due by 6/27/2019; (2) replies due by 7/11/2019; (3) motion hearing set for 8/8/2019 at 2:00 p.m.; (4) initial case management conference set for 8/8/2019 at 2:00 p.m.; and (5) case management statement due by 8/1/2019. This order terminates Docket Number 31. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 7, 2019 Reset Hearing Deadlines as to #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, See Docket No. #32 : Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 32 Renotice motion hearing re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , for Failure to State a Claim, or, in the alternative, to Transfer Venue to the District of Massachusetts filed by1288 Mass Ave LLC, Blackinton Backwoods LLC, Blackinton Mill LLC, Blackinton Operating LLC, Broder Blackinton LLC, Dana Nielsen, Ben Svenson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #27 ) (Mertes, Emily) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 31 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Cortney Burns, Broder Blackinton LLC, The Beyond Place, LLC, Blackinton Backwoods LLC, Blackinton Mill LLC, Blackinton Operating LLC, 1288 Mass Ave LLC, Ben Svenson, Eric Svenson, And Dana Nielsen. (Xifo, Natalie) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2019 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for June 4. 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by May 28, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-01209-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 5/2/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , for Failure to State a Claim, or, in the alternative, to Transfer Venue to the District of Massachusetts filed by 1288 Mass Ave LLC, Blackinton Backwoods LLC, Blackinton Mill LLC, Blackinton Operating LLC, Broder Blackinton LLC, Dana Nielsen, Ben Svenson, Eric Svenson, The Beyond Place LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 5/14/2019. Replies due by 5/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration BEN SVENSON, #2 Proposed Order)(Horgan, Lisa) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 26 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by 1288 Mass Ave LLC, Blackinton Backwoods LLC, Blackinton Mill LLC, Blackinton Operating LLC, Broder Blackinton LLC, Dana Nielsen, Ben Svenson, Eric Svenson, The Beyond Place LLC.. (Mertes, Emily) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by 1288 Mass Ave LLC, Blackinton Backwoods LLC, Blackinton Mill LLC, Blackinton Operating LLC, Broder Blackinton LLC, Dana Nielsen, Ben Svenson, Eric Svenson, The Beyond Place LLC. (Mertes, Emily) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cortney Burns , ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed April 2, 2019 Acknowledgement filed by Cortney Burns. (Xifo, Natalie) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that the Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 6/25/2019 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Case Management Statement is now due by 6/18/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 22 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cortney Burns.. (Xifo, Natalie) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Dana Nielsen. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Eric Svenson. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Ben Svenson. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to 1288 Mass Ave LLC. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Blackinton Operating LLC. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Blackinton Mill LLC. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Blackinton Backwoods LLC. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to The Beyond Place LLC. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Broder Blackinton LLC. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/6/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Cortney Burns E-Filer Entered Parties Incorrectly & Ou t of Sequence. Case Title Entered Incorrectly. Small Party Text Entered Incorrectly. Complaint Text Entered Incorrectly. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/20/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Xifo, Natalie) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Xifo, Natalie) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Xifo, Natalie) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Xifo, Natalie) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Xifo, Natalie) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Xifo, Natalie) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Xifo, Natalie) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Xifo, Natalie) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Xifo, Natalie) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED; against 1288 Mass Ave LLC, The Beyond Place LLC, Blackinton Backwoods LLC, Blackinton Mill LLC, Blackinton Operating LLC, Broder Blackinton LLC, Dana Nielsen, Ben Svenson, Eric Svenson ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13146393.). Filed byCortney Burns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Xifo, Natalie) (Filed on 3/6/2019) Modified on 3/7/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Broder Blackinton LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cortney Burns
Represented By: Natalie Alexandria Xifo
Represented By: Claire E. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackinton Backwoods LLC
Represented By: Liam T. O'Connell
Represented By: Lisa K. Horgan
Represented By: Emily Ann Mertes
Represented By: Emily Grannon Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackinton Mill LLC
Represented By: Liam T. O'Connell
Represented By: Lisa K. Horgan
Represented By: Emily Ann Mertes
Represented By: Emily Grannon Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Nielsen
Represented By: Liam T. O'Connell
Represented By: Lisa K. Horgan
Represented By: Emily Ann Mertes
Represented By: Emily Grannon Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1288 Mass Ave LLC
Represented By: Liam T. O'Connell
Represented By: Lisa K. Horgan
Represented By: Emily Ann Mertes
Represented By: Emily Grannon Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Svenson
Represented By: Liam T. O'Connell
Represented By: Lisa K. Horgan
Represented By: Emily Ann Mertes
Represented By: Emily Grannon Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broder Blackinton LLC
Represented By: Liam T. O'Connell
Represented By: Lisa K. Horgan
Represented By: Emily Ann Mertes
Represented By: Emily Grannon Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Beyond Place LLC
Represented By: Liam T. O'Connell
Represented By: Lisa K. Horgan
Represented By: Emily Ann Mertes
Represented By: Emily Grannon Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Svenson
Represented By: Liam T. O'Connell
Represented By: Lisa K. Horgan
Represented By: Emily Ann Mertes
Represented By: Emily Grannon Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackinton Operating LLC
Represented By: Liam T. O'Connell
Represented By: Lisa K. Horgan
Represented By: Emily Ann Mertes
Represented By: Emily Grannon Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?