Doe et al v. Framingham Public School District et al
Plaintiff: Percy Doe, Sheryl Doe and Keith Doe
Defendant: Bureau Of Special Education Appeals Of Massachusetts and Framingham Public School District
Case Number: 1:2019cv11849
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1415
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Defendants' Assented-to Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants' Answer due by 11/22/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip B. Benjamin on behalf of Framingham Public School District (Benjamin, Philip)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/22/19 to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Bureau Of Special Education Appeals Of Massachusetts, Framingham Public School District.(Haskell, Eric)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A. Haskell on behalf of Bureau Of Special Education Appeals Of Massachusetts (Haskell, Eric)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 12/2/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (adminn, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Percy Doe et al against Framingham Public School District, Bureau Of Special Education Appeals Of Massachusetts Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7855963 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Keith Doe, Sheryl Doe, Percy Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 JS45)(Sindelar, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Framingham Public School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau Of Special Education Appeals Of Massachusetts
Represented By: Eric A. Haskell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Framingham Public School District
Represented By: Eric A. Haskell
Represented By: Philip B. Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Percy Doe
Represented By: Timothy A Sindelar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Doe
Represented By: Timothy A Sindelar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Doe
Represented By: Timothy A Sindelar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?