Franklin v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp
Plaintiff: Gerald Franklin
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp
Case Number: 1:2019cv11863
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #17 Master Long Form Complaint by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.(DaSilva, Carolina)
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 MASTER LONG FORM COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp.(DaSilva, Carolina)
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Orders No. 1-13, (Attachments: #1 Case Managements Orders No. 1-5, #2 Protective Order, #3 ESI Order, #4 Fact Implementation Order, #5 Plaintiff Fact Sheet, #6 Defendant Fact Sheet, #7 Order Aiding Private Settlement)(Jones, Sherry)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO Number: 50, MDL No. 2768 has been transferred from Western District of Louisiana and assigned civil action number: 19-11863. Western District of Louisiana case number: 19-00663. In Re: Striker Orthopaedics LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation (Jones, Sherry)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. (Jones, Sherry)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 6:19-cv-00663.
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 50, directing transfer to District of Massachusetts, In Re: Stryker LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation, MDL # 2768. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Whidden, C)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-50) in MDL No.2768, IN RE: Stryker LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the District of Massachusetts upon request of the record. (crt,Whidden, C)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Howmedica Osteonics Corp . (Attachments: #1 Certified State Court Record)(aty,Moore, Douglas)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, pending receipt of records confirming the identity of the particular medical device at issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/21/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Second MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time to File Answer with consent by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Moore, Douglas) Modified event to more accurately describe document filed on 6/20/2019 (Bunting, M).
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Howmedica Osteonics Corp identifying Corporate Parent Stryker Corp, Other Affiliate Howmedica Osteonics Corp for Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (aty,Moore, Douglas)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/29/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re State Court Service Returned Executed with consent sought but not yet obtained by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Moore, Douglas)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/28/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removalsent to Douglas John Moore, Shannon Marie Jaeckel on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corp. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/7/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 23, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 23, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Howmedica Osteonics Corp answer due 5/30/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC St. Mary Parish, Case Number 133640 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3956802) filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Douglas John Moore added to party Howmedica Osteonics Corp(pty:selreq))(aty,Moore, Douglas) Modified on 5/24/2019 to correct title. (Thigpen, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Franklin
Represented By: Edward J Cloos, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Douglas John Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?