Globys, Inc. v. Sorriso Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Globys, Inc.
Defendant: Sorriso Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11867
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Rajwani, Catherine)
October 30, 2019 Filing 22 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered re #19 JOINT STATEMENT is so ordered as modifed as the ase management scheduling order. DISCOVERY DUE August 4, 2020 and DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE August 21, 2020. (Paine, Matthew)
October 29, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Tellekson, David)
October 29, 2019 Filing 19 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Tellekson, David)
October 16, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G.J. Kaviar on behalf of Globys, Inc. (Kaviar, Eric)
October 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Herling David Romero Adrianza on behalf of Sorriso Technologies, Inc. (Romero Adrianza, Herling)
October 11, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sorriso Technologies, Inc.. (Rajwani, Catherine)
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sorriso Technologies, Inc..(Rajwani, Catherine)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added David K. Tellekson and Jonathan T. McMichael . Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) (Modified on 10/10/2019 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew).
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Carroll, Laura)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Sorriso Technologies, Inc. answer due 10/11/2019. (DLC, law3)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to October 11, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Globys, Inc..(Carroll, Laura)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Globys, Inc.. Sorriso Technologies, Inc. served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Globys, Inc.. (Carroll, Laura)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David K. Tellekson, Jonathan T. McMichael Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7867229 by Globys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of David K. Tellekson, #2 Affidavit Certification of Jonathan T. McMichael)(Carroll, Laura)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sorriso Technologies, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Globys, Inc.. (Carroll, Laura)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Carroll, Laura)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sorriso Technologies, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7859014 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Globys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: US Pat. No. 7996310, #2 Exhibit B: US Pat. No. 7774271, #3 Exhibit C: US Pat. No. 8930252, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet)(Carroll, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Globys, Inc. v. Sorriso Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorriso Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine I. Rajwani
Represented By: Herling David Romero Adrianza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Globys, Inc.
Represented By: Laura L. Carroll
Represented By: Eric G.J. Kaviar
Represented By: David K. Tellekson
Represented By: Jonathan T. McMichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?