Rian Immigrant Center v. Cuccinelli et al
Plaintiff: Irish International Immigrant Center, Inc. and Rian Immigrant Center
Defendant: Director Lori Pietropaolo, Kevin McAleenan, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Transportation Security Administration, Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli, Donald J Trump, The Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director Michael J McCleary, Lori Pietropaoli, Michael J McCleary, Kevin K. McAleenan and Kenneth Cuccinelli
Case Number: 1:2019cv11880
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 23 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER LIFTING STAY. (Kelly, Danielle)
February 28, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, Michael J McCleary, Lori Pietropaoli, The Department of Homeland Security, Donald J Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Kelly, Danielle)
February 28, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by Irish International Immigrant Center, Inc. Change of Party Name (Carroll, Robert)
February 28, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, Michael J McCleary, Lori Pietropaoli, The Department of Homeland Security, Donald J Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Thorp, Galen). Modified on 3/4/2020: Main document replaced to extract Memorandum in Support to properly file in separate entry. (Kelly, Danielle).
February 7, 2020 Filing 19 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered: ALLOWING #18 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order. Please see attached Order. (Kelly, Danielle)
February 5, 2020 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Transportation Security Administration, Michael J McCleary, Lori Pietropaoli, The Department of Homeland Security, Donald J Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thorp, Galen)
February 4, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Galen N. Thorp on behalf of Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Transportation Security Administration, Michael J McCleary, Lori Pietropaoli, The Department of Homeland Security, Donald J Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (Thorp, Galen)
January 28, 2020 Filing 16 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: Electronic order administratively staying case for 30 days. The parties shall submit a jointly proposed briefing schedule for Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss.(Kelly, Danielle)
January 27, 2020 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT Jointly Filed by Plaintiff and by Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Transportation Security Administration, Michael J McCleary, Lori Pietropaoli, The Department of Homeland Security, Donald J Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Plaintiff's Proposal), #2 Text of Proposed Order (Defendants' Proposal))(Thorp, Galen)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 11/05/2019, is canceled. (MacDonald, Gail)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered granting #12 Motion to Stay. (MacDonald, Gail)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay by Irish International Immigrant Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Robert)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Transportation Security Administration, Michael J McCleary, Lori Pietropaoli, The Department of Homeland Security, Donald J Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (Farquhar, Rayford)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Rachel M. Walsh. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; ALLOWING #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ira J. Levy. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ira J. Levy Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7872608 by Irish International Immigrant Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Ira J. Levy)(Carroll, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Rachel M. Walsh Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7872586 by Irish International Immigrant Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Rachel M. Walsh)(Carroll, Robert)
September 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Segal on behalf of Irish International Immigrant Center, Inc. (Segal, Matthew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adriana Lafaille on behalf of Irish International Immigrant Center, Inc. (Lafaille, Adriana)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Irish International Immigrant Center, Inc.. (Carroll, Robert)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7861525 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Irish International Immigrant Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Carroll, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rian Immigrant Center v. Cuccinelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Lori Pietropaolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Transportation Security Administration
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J Trump
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Galen N. Thorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Galen N. Thorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Galen N. Thorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director Michael J McCleary
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Pietropaoli
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Galen N. Thorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J McCleary
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Galen N. Thorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Galen N. Thorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Galen N. Thorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irish International Immigrant Center, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Carroll
Represented By: Ira J. Levy
Represented By: Rachel M. Walsh
Represented By: Matthew Segal
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rian Immigrant Center
Represented By: Robert D. Carroll
Represented By: Ira J. Levy
Represented By: Rachel M. Walsh
Represented By: Matthew Segal
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?