Dadzie v. Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation
Plaintiff: Phyllis Dadzie
Defendant: Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv11892
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #8 Notice of Settlement. Treated as a motion for 30 day nisi order and allowed. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement in principle and motion to vacate all deadlines by Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation (Bosse, Peter)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT Record. Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation summons served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Copy re 5 Scheduling Order mailed to Phyllis Dadzie on 9/16/2019. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Answer having been filed in this personal injury case, the court orders the following pretrial schedule:Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be completed by 10/13/19; Motions for leave to Amend Pleadings & Joinder of Parties due by 12/6/19; Without leave of court, the parties are permitted to serve 30 interrogatories, 30 requests for admissions and 30 document requests, to be filed within the 30 days of the initial disclosures, and expects responses to be made in thirty days, unless a request for additional time is granted. A party may not notice more than 5 deponents without leave of court on a showing of good cause. If the parties would like to participate in the court's mediation program, they must notify our docket clerk Arnold Pacho (617-748-9812) by 1/24/20, as it will take several weeks to schedule a mediation date.All fact discovery to be completed by 3/13/19; Dispositive Motions, if any, due by 4/10/20 (no experts utilized) with Oppositions due 5/1/20; Reply, if any, by leave of court. If the parties intend to utilize expert witnesses, you must notify the court no later than 2/14/20, so that the court can amend the pretrial schedule. The court notes that, in this session, treating physicians are not required to produce Rule 26 reports if producing his or her relevant treatment records. Plaintiff's relevant medical records are produced as part of fact discovery by plaintiff or by plaintiff's counsel presenting to defendant completed releases for relevant records and providers by 10/13/19 as part of her automatic disclosures. If treatment continues, plaintiff is obligated to supplement these records under the procedural rules.(Zierk, Marsha)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation.(Bosse, Peter)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (DeMaria, Timothy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation (Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7864561 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D) (Bosse, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2019 since not initially included by counsel: #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Local Category Form) (DeMaria, Timothy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dadzie v. Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation
Represented By: Peter L. Bosse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Dadzie
Represented By: Stephen D. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?