Boutin v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Boutin
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv11907
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Don Ledgard on behalf of Amanda Boutin (Ledgard, Don)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Gail Roma on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Roma, Jennifer)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 MDL Records received from the District of Arizona, Case number: 16-913.. (Attachments: #1 lead docket sheet, #2 case management orders part 1, #3 case management orders part 2, #4 discovery orders, #5 discovery and priviege orders, #6 daubert orders, #7 motion in limine orders, #8 depo designation orders, #9 miscellaneous orders, #10 master and short form pleadings)(Jones, Sherry)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Case remanded from the District of Arizona; Case Number 16-00913. (Jones, Sherry)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-00913.
September 6, 2019 Remark: Case Transferred to the District of Massachusetts via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP)
April 1, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-913-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 1, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12811782 filed by Amanda Boutin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boutin v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Roma
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Roma
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Boutin
Represented By: Don K Ledgard
Represented By: Don Ledgard
Represented By: Robert Williams Goldwater, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?