ADEC Private Equity Investments, LLC v. Biochemics, Inc et al
Plaintiff: ADEC Private Equity Investments, LLC
Defendant: Jan Schlichtmann, Biochemics, Inc, Zhen Zhu PH.D. and John Masiz
Debtor: Inpellis, Inc.
Trustee: John Fitzgerald and John Aquino
Not Yet Classified: Amory L Ross, PRK Trust and BTR Trust
Case Number: 1:2019cv11916
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Compel ADEC To Correct Record Regarding ADEC's False Accusations That Defendants Engaged In Crime & Fraud, #13 MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendants Jan Schlichtmann, Zhen Zhu, and John Masiz and (ii) in Support of ADEC's Motion for Sanctions Against Defendants Jan Schlichtmann, Zhen Zhu, and John Masiz filed by ADEC Private Equity Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21)(Cacace, Joseph)
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendants Jan Schlichtmann, Zhen Zhu, and John Masiz by ADEC Private Equity Investments, LLC.(Cacace, Joseph)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Compel ADEC To Correct Record Regarding ADEC's False Accusations That Defendants Engaged In Crime & Fraud filed by John Masiz, Jan Schlichtmann, Zhen Zhu PH.D.. (Schlichtmann, Jan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel ADEC To Correct Record Regarding ADEC's False Accusations That Defendants Engaged In Crime & Fraud by John Masiz, Jan Schlichtmann, Zhen Zhu PH.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A (Illustration Re G-4 v VALE Technology (Inpellis Doc. #94-34))), #2 Exhibit Ex B (BioChemics Doc. 560 "Ex 1"), #3 Exhibit Ex C (9-5-19 BioChemics Hearing))(Schlichtmann, Jan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to "Respondents'" Opposition to ADEC's Motion to Transfer "Respondents'" Motion to Withdraw the Reference to the Honorable Mark L. Wolf Defendants' Do Not Oppose ADEC's Motion For Leave To File A Reply filed by John Masiz, Jan Schlichtmann, Zhen Zhu PH.D.. (Schlichtmann, Jan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to "Respondents'" Opposition to ADEC's Motion to Transfer "Respondents'" Motion to Withdraw the Reference to the Honorable Mark L. Wolf by ADEC Private Equity Investments, LLC.(Cacace, Joseph)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 Opposition re #5 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Honorable Mark L. Wolf to Massachusetts. filed by John Masiz, Jan Schlichtmann, Zhen Zhu PH.D.. (Schlichtmann, Jan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Withdraw Reference 9-2-19 Amended Motion For Withdrawal Of Reference Transmitted To the District Court 9-6-19 9-2-19 Respondents' Amended Memorandum Transmitted To District Court 9-6-19 With Exhibits 1-5 filed by John Masiz, Jan Schlichtmann, Zhen Zhu PH.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 (8-7-19 Masiz Aff), #2 Exhibit Ex 2 (6-5-17 Owsley Aff), #3 Exhibit Ex 3 ((6-8-17 Barrette Aff), #4 Exhibit Ex 4 (12-17-18 ADEC "Demand Letter"), #5 Exhibit Ex 5 (3-12-19 Inpellis Hearing))(Schlichtmann, Jan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw Reference 9-2-19 Amended Motion For Withdrawal Of Reference Transmitted To the District Court 9-6-19 by John Masiz, Jan Schlichtmann, Zhen Zhu PH.D..(Schlichtmann, Jan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Honorable Mark L. Wolf to Massachusetts. by ADEC Private Equity Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cacace, Joseph)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Opposition re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by ADEC Private Equity Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Cacace, Joseph)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET SHEET from Bankruptcy Court record re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Respondent's Jan Schlichtmann, Zhen Zhu, PH.D. and John Masiz (Coppola, Katelyn) Modified on 9/17/2019 (Coppola, Katelyn).
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Respondent's Jan Schlichtmann, Zhen Zhu, PH.D. and John Masiz (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn) Modified on 9/9/2019 (Coppola, Katelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADEC Private Equity Investments, LLC v. Biochemics, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Schlichtmann
Represented By: Jan R. Schlichtmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biochemics, Inc
Represented By: Michael P. Angelini
Represented By: Francis J. DiMento
Represented By: Jan R. Schlichtmann
Represented By: Douglas T. Radigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhen Zhu PH.D.
Represented By: Jan R. Schlichtmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Masiz
Represented By: John A. Sten
Represented By: Michael P. Angelini
Represented By: Jan R. Schlichtmann
Represented By: Douglas T. Radigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Inpellis, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Sternklar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John Aquino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADEC Private Equity Investments, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Bresnahan
Represented By: Howard M. Cooper
Represented By: Peter Sabin Willett
Represented By: Joseph M. Cacace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Amory L Ross
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Bresnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PRK Trust
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Bresnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BTR Trust
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Bresnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?