Alvarado Mendez v. Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Alvarado Mendez
Defendant: Officer Christopher Dowd, Officer Nancy Hanley, Officer John McDonough, Officer Alexander Scott, Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority, Supervising Officers Johns and Janes Doe and Officer Steven Guidaboni
Case Number: 1:2019cv11919
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 25 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Motion Hearing held on 11/7/2019 re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority,. Judge hears counsel and takes matter under advisement;. ( Discovery to be completed by 3/31/2020), ( Status Conference set for 4/9/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel.). (Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Newbill & Donohue) (Urso, Lisa)
November 6, 2019 Filing 24 First CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3) by Jonathan Alvarado Mendez.(Newbill, Lucas)
November 4, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 for Officer Steven Guidaboni. (Donohue, Thomas)
November 1, 2019 Filing 22 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Donohue, Thomas)
November 1, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 for Defendant, Officer John McDonough. (Donohue, Thomas)
November 1, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 for Defendant, Officer Christopher Dowd. (Donohue, Thomas)
October 25, 2019 Filing 19 First Opposition re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jonathan Alvarado Mendez. (Newbill, Lucas)
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. (Donohue, Thomas)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority.(Donohue, Thomas)
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Officer Alexander Scott, Officer Nancy Hanley, Officer Steven Guidaboni, Officer John McDonough, Officer Christopher Dowd. (Donohue, Thomas)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT #1 against All Defendants, filed by Jonathan Alvarado Mendez.(Newbill, Lucas)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion to Amend by assent. (Urso, Lisa)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 First MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 First MOTION to Amend the Complaint filed by Jonathan Alvarado Mendez. (Newbill, Lucas)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION to Amend the Complaint by Jonathan Alvarado Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX 1. Amended Complaint in Blackline Form, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2. Amended Complaint in Clean Form for Filing)(Newbill, Lucas)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File to 10/7/19. (Urso, Lisa)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 7, 2019 to File a Responsive Pleading by Officer Christopher Dowd, Officer Steven Guidaboni, Officer Nancy Hanley, Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority, Officer John McDonough, Officer Alexander Scott.(Donohue, Thomas)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Donohue, Thomas)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 9/30/2019 (Urso, Lisa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 30, 2019 to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Officer Christopher Dowd, Officer Steven Guidaboni, Officer Nancy Hanley, Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority, Officer John McDonough, Officer Alexander Scott.(Donohue, Thomas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard H. Kesten on behalf of Officer Christopher Dowd, Officer Steven Guidaboni, Officer Nancy Hanley, Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority, Officer John McDonough, Officer Alexander Scott (Kesten, Leonard)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R Donohue on behalf of Officer Christopher Dowd, Officer Steven Guidaboni, Officer Nancy Hanley, Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority, Officer John McDonough, Officer Alexander Scott (Donohue, Thomas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Officer Christopher Dowd, Officer Steven Guidaboni, Officer Nancy Hanley, Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority, Officer John McDonough, Officer Alexander Scott ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7869773 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donohue, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarado Mendez v. Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Christopher Dowd
Represented By: Thomas R Donohue
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Nancy Hanley
Represented By: Thomas R Donohue
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John McDonough
Represented By: Thomas R Donohue
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Alexander Scott
Represented By: Thomas R Donohue
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority
Represented By: Thomas R Donohue
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supervising Officers Johns and Janes Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Steven Guidaboni
Represented By: Thomas R Donohue
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Alvarado Mendez
Represented By: Lucas J. Newbill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?