Higgins v. Peabody Properties
Plaintiff: John T. Higgins
Defendant: Peabody Properties
Case Number: 1:2019cv11928
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 Copy re 8 Order on Motion for Hearing mailed to John T. Higgins on 9/18/2019. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #7 Motion for Hearing. (PSSA, 4)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Hearing by John T. Higgins. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Copy re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #5 Order Dismissing Case mailed to John T. Higgins on 9/12/2019. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 4)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Clerk shall enter a separate order of dismissal. (PSSA, 4)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John T. Higgins.(Castilla, Francis)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Peabody Properties, filed by John T. Higgins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higgins v. Peabody Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peabody Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?