Fusco v. Spaulding
Petitioner: Emilio Fusco
Respondent: Stephen Spaulding
Case Number: 1:2019cv11944
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 USCA Case Number 19-2023 for #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Emilio Fusco. (Paine, Matthew)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #8 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #6 Order, #7 Order Dismissing Case by Emilio Fusco. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 10/29/2019. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 3)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. The court DENIES the petition and DISMISSES this action.(PSSA, 3)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily O. Cannon on behalf of Stephen Spaulding (Cannon, Emily)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Emilio Fusco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Castilla, Francis)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Emilio Fusco.(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fusco v. Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen Spaulding
Represented By: Emily O. Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Emilio Fusco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?