Stark v. Ameriprise Financial, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kerri Stark
Defendant: Janell Canha and Ameriprise Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11950
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kerri Stark. Janell Canha waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Reiling, Richard)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Juliet A. Davison on behalf of Janell Canha (Davison, Juliet)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kerri Stark. Janell Canha waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Reiling, Richard)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah B. Herlihy on behalf of Ameriprise Financial, Inc. (Herlihy, Sarah)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kerri Stark. Ameriprise Financial, Inc. waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Reiling, Richard)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Vetere on behalf of Ameriprise Financial, Inc. (Vetere, Peter)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7876587 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Kerri Stark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reiling, Richard) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/13/2019) (Pacho, Arnold). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2019: #2 Exhibit) (Pacho, Arnold). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2019: #3 Category Form) (Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stark v. Ameriprise Financial, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janell Canha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriprise Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerri Stark
Represented By: Richard B. Reiling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?