APG Security-RI, LLC v Devens Treatment & Recovery Center, LLC
Plaintiff: APG Security-RI, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11954
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Devens Treatment & Recovery Center, LLC served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Pogue, Mark)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Devens Treatment & Recovery Center, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Devens Treatment & Recovery Center, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7877122 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by APG Security-RI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Pogue, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: APG Security-RI, LLC v Devens Treatment & Recovery Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APG Security-RI, LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Pogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?