Cunningham v. Lyft, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Melody Cunningham
Defendant: Lyft, Inc., Logan Green and John Zimmer
Case Number: 1:2019cv11974
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support thereof filed by Melody Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
November 13, 2019 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer. (Smeallie, James)
November 7, 2019 Filing 51 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #37 Opposition to Motion,. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by 11/15/2019. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy, contain appropriate (number/letter) tabs, reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF, and be placed in a 3-ring binder. (Vieira, Leonardo)
November 6, 2019 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #38 Opposition to Motion of Laura M. Brown. (Smeallie, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #38 Opposition to Motion of Steven Charles. (Smeallie, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #38 Opposition to Motion of Bruno De Souza. (Smeallie, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #38 Opposition to Motion of Paul Gemmell. (Smeallie, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #38 Opposition to Motion of David Moyer. (Smeallie, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #39 Affidavit in Support of Stephen Sainte-Martin. (Smeallie, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #38 Opposition to Motion of Eden G. Sellassie. (Smeallie, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #38 Opposition to Motion of Jon Paul Prunier. (Smeallie, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #38 Opposition to Motion of Ian Muir. (Smeallie, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #38 Opposition to Motion of Christopher Sholley. (Smeallie, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #38 Opposition to Motion of Robert Crandall. (Smeallie, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #38 Opposition to Motion of Jeffrey Y. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Smeallie, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 38 Opposition re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support thereof filed by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer. (Smeallie, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 37 Opposition re #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Melody Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
October 24, 2019 Filing 36 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #35 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to November 6, 2019 to File Oppositions. (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 22, 2019 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to November 6, 2019 to File Oppositions by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer.(Smeallie, James)
October 21, 2019 Filing 34 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Rohit K. Singla, Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; ALLOWING #31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Justin P. Raphael, Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; ALLOWING #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Adele M. El-Khouri Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; ALLOWING #33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jeffrey Y. Wu. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 17, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jeffrey Y. Wu Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7927820 by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smeallie, James)
October 17, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Adele M. El-Khouri Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7927799 by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smeallie, James)
October 17, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Justin P. Raphael Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7927782 by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smeallie, James)
October 17, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Rohit K. Singla Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7927745 by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smeallie, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 16, 2019 Filing 28 Transcript of Status Conference held on October 9, 2019, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 11/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2020. (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 11, 2019 Filing 27 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Assented-to Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading #24 . Defendants' responsive pleading shall be filed not later than fourteen (14) days after the court rules on Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration #16 . (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 10, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support thereof, #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings : Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
October 10, 2019 Filing 25 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Status Conference held 10/9/19. Case called. Court had colloquy with counsel. MOTION to Transfer Case to Judge Stearns #10 denied w/o prejudice in open court. By 10/30/19 Def. to file an opposition to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #4 ; content to be limited to irreparable harm and other claims but not on the merits of the claim. By 10/30/19 Pltff. to file opposition to #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Def. allowed a short (less than 10 pgs.) reply, due 11/13/19. Hearing set for 12/9/19 at 9:30 a.m. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Liss-Riordan, Pagano, Smeallie, Maroney, Silvia) (MacDonald, Gail) Modified on 10/10/2019 (MacDonald, Gail).
October 10, 2019 Filing 24 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer.(Smeallie, James)
October 4, 2019 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 10/9/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
October 4, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 10/09/2019 is canceled per the ELECTRONIC ORDER at 21 . (MacDonald, Gail)
October 4, 2019 Filing 21 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #20 Defendants' Emergency Motion to Waive Rule 16 Requirements. After specifically requesting that the court set a "Rule 16 conference" (see Joint Motion to Stay and for a Rule 16 Conference), Defendants now state that they "did not intend for the Court to hold the traditional initial scheduling conference at this time." The court will proceed on October 9, 2019, with a status conference in this matter, and may hear argument, as the court finds necessary, on the pending motion to transfer #10 . (MacDonald, Gail)
October 3, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION Waive Rule 16 Requirements for October 9, 2019 Status Conference by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer.(Smeallie, James)
October 3, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings of Jeannie Lieu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smeallie, James)
October 3, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings of Oluwabukunmi Ayanbule. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smeallie, James)
October 3, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smeallie, James)
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer.(Smeallie, James)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 Opposition re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to Judge Stearns filed by Melody Cunningham. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2019 02:45 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion to Stay (MacDonald, Gail)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay and for a Rule 16 Conference by Melody Cunningham.(Pagano, Adelaide)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Adelaide H. Pagano on behalf of Melody Cunningham (Pagano, Adelaide)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case to Judge Stearns by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer.(Smeallie, James)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lyft, Inc.. (Smeallie, James)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew E. Silvia on behalf of Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer (Silvia, Andrew)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Maroney on behalf of Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer (Maroney, Michael)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Santeusanio on behalf of Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer (Santeusanio, David)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Smeallie on behalf of Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer (Smeallie, James)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support thereof by Melody Cunningham.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Zimmer, Logan Green, Lyft, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7881923 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Melody Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form for New Civil Cases, #3 Proposed Summons - Lyft Inc., #4 Proposed Summons - John Zimmer, #5 Proposed Summons - Logan Green)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Lyft, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody Cunningham
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Adelaide H. Pagano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Santeusanio
Represented By: Jeffrey Y Wu
Represented By: Adele M. El-Khouri
Represented By: Andrew E. Silvia
Represented By: Justin P Raphael
Represented By: James D. Smeallie
Represented By: Rohit K Singla
Represented By: Michael T. Maroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Green
Represented By: David J. Santeusanio
Represented By: Jeffrey Y Wu
Represented By: Adele M. El-Khouri
Represented By: Andrew E. Silvia
Represented By: Justin P Raphael
Represented By: James D. Smeallie
Represented By: Rohit K Singla
Represented By: Michael T. Maroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Zimmer
Represented By: David J. Santeusanio
Represented By: Jeffrey Y Wu
Represented By: Adele M. El-Khouri
Represented By: Andrew E. Silvia
Represented By: Justin P Raphael
Represented By: James D. Smeallie
Represented By: Rohit K Singla
Represented By: Michael T. Maroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?