Sutherland v. Saul
Plaintiff: Brian Sutherland
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv11989
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. Procedural Order re Social Security Action (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Beller on behalf of Andrew Saul (Beller, Susan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Local Rule 4.1 and instructions for service by the United States Marshals Service attached. USM 285 form may be found at www.usmarshals.gov/process/usm285.pdf and is also available from the Clerk upon request. (Attachments: #1 Instructions and Local Rule 4.1)(PSSA, 3)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. The Clerk shall issue a summons. The plaintiff is responsible for serving the complaint and summons on the defendant in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 4.1 within 90 days of the date the summons is issued. If so asked by the plaintiff, the United States Marshals Service shall complete service as directed by the plaintiff with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. The plaintiff is responsible for providing the United States Marshals Service all papers for service. (PSSA, 3)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Warnock, Douglas)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian Sutherland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)(Greenberg, Morris)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (Fee Status: IFP requested), filed by Brian Sutherland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Category Form, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Summons, #5 Exhibit Summons)(Greenberg, Morris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutherland v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Susan Beller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Sutherland
Represented By: Morris Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Christopher Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?