Mederos v. US. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Plaintiff: Antonio Mederos
Defendant: US. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 1:2019cv12007
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Order Dismissing Case, #5 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel by Antonio Mederos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Paine, Matthew)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 3)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel and ordering that action be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. (PSSA, 3)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Castilla, Francis)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Antonio Mederos. (Attachments: #1 Supplement request for counsel)(Castilla, Francis)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against US. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, filed by Antonio Mederos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mederos v. US. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Mederos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?