Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund et al v. F & Y Construction LLC
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund and New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund
Defendant: F & Y Construction LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv12019
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed F & Y Construction LLC served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (Sills, Anne)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sasha N. Gillin on behalf of Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund (Gillin, Sasha)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan P. Goldstein on behalf of Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund (Goldstein, Nathan)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to F & Y Construction LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
September 26, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against F & Y Construction LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7894894 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet & Title Sheet)(Sills, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund et al v. F & Y Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F & Y Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund
Represented By: Anne R. Sills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund
Represented By: Anne R. Sills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund
Represented By: Anne R. Sills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Anne R. Sills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Anne R. Sills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?