AB SCIEX LLC v. Haddad et al
Plaintiff: AB SCIEX LLC
Defendant: Rami Haddad and Zef Scientific, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv12030
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. In light of D. 33, the hearing set for 11/20/19 is cancelled. (Hourihan, Lisa)
November 19, 2019 Filing 33 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #32 Stipulation filed by Rami Haddad, Zef Scientific, Inc. APPROVED. (Hourihan, Lisa)
November 19, 2019 Filing 32 STIPULATION - Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Amended Scheduling Order - by Rami Haddad, Zef Scientific, Inc.. (Schoen, Laurence)
November 8, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Rami Haddad, Zef Scientific, Inc.. (Schoen, Laurence)
November 8, 2019 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #26 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Affidavit of Michael Kunkel). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schoen, Laurence)
November 8, 2019 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #26 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Affidavit of Benjamin A. Nix). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schoen, Laurence)
November 8, 2019 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #26 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Affidavit of Rami Haddad). (Demeo, Joseph)
November 8, 2019 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #26 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Affidavit of Dr. Zoubair El Fallah). (Schoen, Laurence)
November 8, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Rami Haddad, Zef Scientific, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Defendants' Proposed] Consent Order of Preliminary Injunction)(Schoen, Laurence)
November 7, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison L. Huppe on behalf of Rami Haddad (Huppe, Allison)
November 6, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph L Demeo on behalf of Rami Haddad (Demeo, Joseph)
October 31, 2019 Filing 23 Joint Stipulation and Scheduling Order Establishing Briefing Schedule for Pending Motions and Responsive Pleadings. NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #14 MOTION to Expedite Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
October 25, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zef Scientific, Inc.. (Schoen, Laurence)
October 25, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Kanstroom Musgrave on behalf of Zef Scientific, Inc. (Musgrave, Emily)
October 25, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurence A. Schoen on behalf of Zef Scientific, Inc. (Schoen, Laurence)
October 25, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #14 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Joint with Defendants) by AB SCIEX LLC. (Mertineit, Dawn)
October 25, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed Zef Scientific, Inc. served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Mertineit, Dawn)
October 25, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed Rami Haddad served on 10/22/2019. (Mertineit, Dawn)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Dallin R. Wilson on behalf of AB SCIEX LLC (Wilson, Dallin)
October 14, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by AB SCIEX LLC. (Mertineit, Dawn)
October 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by AB SCIEX LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (proposed discovery, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Mertineit, Dawn)
October 14, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Matthew Christoff in Support re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by AB SCIEX LLC. (Mertineit, Dawn)
October 14, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Richard Lutkus) filed by AB SCIEX LLC. (Mertineit, Dawn)
October 14, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Kevin Roberts filed by AB SCIEX LLC. (Mertineit, Dawn)
October 14, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by AB SCIEX LLC. (Mertineit, Dawn)
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by AB SCIEX LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mertineit, Dawn)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine E. Perrelli on behalf of AB SCIEX LLC (Perrelli, Katherine)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #2 Motion to Seal Exhibits G-L to the Complaint (Hourihan, Lisa)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Rami Haddad, Zef Scientific, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AB SCIEX LLC, d/b/a SCIEX identifying Corporate Parent Danaher Corporation for AB SCIEX LLC, d/b/a SCIEX.. (Mertineit, Dawn)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint,, Certain Exhibits to Complaint by AB SCIEX LLC, d/b/a SCIEX. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Mertineit, Dawn)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zef Scientific, Inc., Rami Haddad Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7898765 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by AB SCIEX LLC, d/b/a SCIEX. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G (under seal), #8 Exhibit H (under seal), #9 Exhibit I (under seal), #10 Exhibit J (under seal), #11 Exhibit K (under seal), #12 Exhibit L (under seal), #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 JS45 Case Category Form, #17 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Mertineit, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AB SCIEX LLC v. Haddad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AB SCIEX LLC
Represented By: Dawn M. Mertineit
Represented By: Katherine E. Perrelli
Represented By: Dallin R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rami Haddad
Represented By: Joseph L Demeo
Represented By: Allison L. Huppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zef Scientific, Inc.
Represented By: Laurence A. Schoen
Represented By: Emily Kanstroom Musgrave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?