Dominguez Gabriel v. Spaulding
Petitioner: Hector Dominguez Gabriel
Respondent: Stephen Spaulding
Case Number: 1:2019cv12060
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
Presiding Judge: David H Hennessy
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 Filing fee/payment: $5.00, receipt number 1BST077216 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), #3 Order, (Coppola, Katelyn)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 Copy re 6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, mailed to Hector Dominguez Gabriel on 10/28/19. (King, Dawn)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying as moot #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. On October 16, 2019, Respondent Stephen Spaulding moved for an extension of time to respond to the Petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus, Docket entry #4 . Prior to a ruling on the motion, Respondent filed a motion to dismiss the petition, Docket entry #5 . Therefore, the #4 motion for extension is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. (King, Dawn)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Stephen Spaulding.(Tolkoff, Benjamin)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/6/19 to File Response/Reply by Stephen Spaulding.(Tolkoff, Benjamin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: PROCEDURAL ORDER entered. If petitioner wishes to proceed with this action, within 21 days of the date of this Procedural Order, he either must (1) pay the $5.00 filing fee; or (2) file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified prison account statement. The Clerk shall provide petitioner with an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs.(PSSA, 4)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Hector Dominguez Gabriel.(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominguez Gabriel v. Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen Spaulding
Represented By: Benjamin Tolkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hector Dominguez Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?