Idada v. Spaulding
Petitioner: Elvis Henry Idada
Respondent: Stephen Spaulding
Case Number: 1:2019cv12078
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: M Page Kelley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. The answer or responsive pleading is due no later than 21 days from receipt of this order.(PSSA, 4)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee/payment: $5.00, receipt number 1BST077215 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), #3 PSSA Order 2 (Coppola, Katelyn)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filing fee. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days. (PSSA, 4)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Elvis Henry Idada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Idada v. Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elvis Henry Idada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?