Pierre Louis v. Connelly et al
Plaintiff: Marcus Pierre Louis
Defendant: James Connelly, James Perkins, Robert Suza and Stoughton District Court
Case Number: 1:2019cv12082
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Castilla, Francis)
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF RE: service of summons and complaint by the U.S, Marshal. Copy of Local Rule 4.1. (PSSA, 4)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE: re payment of fee (prisoner filer) issued to the Treasurer at MCI Concord (PSSA, 4)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), the Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $17.55. The remainder of the fee, $332.45, shall be collected in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2).The Clerk shall issue summonses for service of the complaint on James Connelly, James Perkins and Robert Suza. The plaintiff may elect to have service made by the United States Marshals Service.. Notwithstanding Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and Local Rule 4.1, the plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of issuance of summons to complete service. (PSSA, 4)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcus Pierre Louis. (Pacho, Arnold)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcus Pierre Louis. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filling fee. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days. (Castilla, Francis)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Marcus Pierre Louis. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filling fee. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days. (Castilla, Francis)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Marcus Pierre Louis.(Castilla, Francis)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcus Pierre Louis.(Castilla, Francis)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Marcus Pierre Louis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierre Louis v. Connelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Pierre Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Suza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stoughton District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?