Jacques v. Commissioner of the Department of Correction et al
Plaintiff: Eden Chevelle Jacques
Defendant: Thomas Turco, Commissioner of the Department of Correction and Commissioner of Correction
Case Number: 1:2019cv12083
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Eden Chevelle Jacques re payment of fee (prisoner filer). (Russo, Noreen)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 Notice to Plaintiff and Local Rule 4.1 to complete service (Castilla, Francis)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Correction, Thomas Turco. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Castilla, Francis)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE: re payment of fee (prisoner filer) issued to the Treasurer at SUFFOLK COUNTY HOUSE OF CORRECTION (PSSA, 3)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk shall provide the plaintiff with the form for Consent/Refusal of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction and the instructions for that form. The clerk shall issue summonses for both defendants. The plaintiff is responsible for ensuring that the summonses, complaint, consent package, and this order are served on the defendants in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Because the plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis, he may elect to have service completed by the United States Marshals Service. The plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of the issuance of the summons to complete service. Each party (or their counsel) must inform the Court whether the party consents to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge within 30 days after the date of service of the summons and complaint on the last party. (PSSA, 3)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eden Chevelle Jacques.(Castilla, Francis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2019: #1 Inmate Statement) (Castilla, Francis).
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Eden Chevelle Jacques.(Castilla, Francis)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas Turco, Commissioner of the Department of Correction, filed by Eden Chevelle Jacques. (Attachments: #1 part of complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacques v. Commissioner of the Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eden Chevelle Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Turco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?