Duff v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Plaintiff: Patti Duff
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp
Case Number: 1:2019cv12085
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #12 Master Long Form Complaint by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 MASTER LONG FORM COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Orders 1-13, (Attachments: #1 Case Management Orders 1-5, #2 Protective Order, #3 ESI Order, #4 Fact Sheet Implementation Order, #5 Plaintiff Fact Sheet, #6 Defendant Fact Sheet, #7 Order Aiding Private Settlement)(Jones, Sherry)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. (Jones, Sherry)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO Number: 51, MDL No. 2768 has been transferred from Middle District of Florida and assigned civil action number: 19-12085. Middle District of Florida case number: 19-2324. In Re: Striker Orthopaedics LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation (Jones, Sherry)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:19-cv-02324.
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: District of Massachusetts re MDL case number: 2768. (AG)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER: On September 18, 2019, Defendant Howmedica Osteonics Corp. removed this case from state court. (Doc. #1 ). According to the Notice of Removal, Howmedica was served on August 30, 2019. (Id.). Therefore, Howmedica's response to the Complaint was due September 25, 2019. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(2). But no response to the Complaint has been filed, and Plaintiff Patti Duff has not promptly applied to the Clerk for entry of default pursuant to Local Rule 1.07(b). Accordingly, Duff is directed to show cause by October 9, 2019, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Rule 3.10(a). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/3/2019. (MWS)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/23/2019. (TWL)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by October 7, 2019, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/23/2019. (MWS)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-2324-T-33SPF. (SJB)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(McLoone, Jennifer)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 12th Judicial Circuit, in and for Manatee County, Florida, case number 2019CA002523 filed in State Court on 6/1/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15934103 filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(McLoone, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duff v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp
Represented By: Hildy M. Sastre
Represented By: Jennifer Ann McLoone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patti Duff
Represented By: William Lee Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?