IRABOR v. Lufthansa Airlines
Plaintiff: BRIGHT U IRABOR
Defendant: Lufthansa Airlines
Case Number: 1:2019cv12087
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND to the State Court(Halley, Taylor)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND(Halley, Taylor)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 EXHIBIT re #9 Notice (Other) Exhibits A to C in Support of Reply, by BRIGHT U IRABOR. (Amadi, Benneth)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by BRIGHT U IRABOR re #8 Memorandum of Law ; Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Remand to State Court. (Amadi, Benneth)
November 17, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Lufthansa Airlines. (Arnold, Steven)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT Record Lufthansa Airlines summons served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019.. (Arnold, Steven)
November 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Opposition and Objections to Removal, and Request for Remand by BRIGHT U IRABOR. (Amadi, Benneth)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Lufthansa Airlines re #1 Notice of Removal Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Arnold, Steven)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Arnold on behalf of Lufthansa Airlines (Arnold, Steven)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lufthansa Airlines ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7915226 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit A)(Arnold, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IRABOR v. Lufthansa Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIGHT U IRABOR
Represented By: Benneth O. Amadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lufthansa Airlines
Represented By: Steven E. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?