Vara et al v. Devos et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Wilson and Diana Vara
Defendant: Elisabeth Devos and United States Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2019cv12175
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. The court will convene a combined Status Conference in Commonwealth v. U.S. Department of Education et. al. Civil Action 19cv12177 and Vara v. DeVos et. al. 19cv12175 on 1/6/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-12175-LTS, 1:19-cv-12177-LTS(Montes, Mariliz)
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #11 Motion for Class Certification to 1/27/2020 is ALLOWED. There shall be no further extensions in this date as the Court notes this provides the United States more than two months to respond to the pending motion. Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Certify Class : Responses due by 1/27/2020.(Montes, Mariliz)
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Elisabeth Devos and Plaintiffs. (Johnson, Anita)
December 2, 2019 Filing 14 Set Deadlines: Supplemental statement re response to the Complaint due by 12/4/2019 re 13 order (Simeone, Maria)
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Defendant shall supplement their motion by December 4, 2019 with a statement of when their response to the Complaint is due, whether they anticipate filing an answer as opposed to a dispositive motion and the parties joint or separate views as to the relationship of the class motion and any dispositive motion. In the meantime, the Court extends the deadline for responding to the class motion by two weeks without prejudice to further ruling on the motion. MOTION to Certify Class Responses due by 12/11/2019 (adminn, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/27/2020 to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Certify Class by Elisabeth Devos, United States Department of Education.(Johnson, Anita)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Certify Class by Diana Vara, Amanda Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit D. Vara, #2 Affidavit A. Wilson, #3 Affidavit T. Merrill, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8)(Merrill, Toby)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kyra A. Taylor. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Diana Vara, Amanda Wilson. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by Diana Vara, Amanda Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts)(Connor, Eileen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Annapurna Balakrishna on behalf of Elisabeth Devos, United States Department of Education (Balakrishna, Annapurna)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kyra A. Taylor Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7961115 by Diana Vara, Amanda Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit K. Taylor Affidavit)(Merrill, Toby)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of Elisabeth Devos, United States Department of Education (Johnson, Anita)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Toby Merrill on behalf of Diana Vara, Amanda Wilson (Merrill, Toby)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 1/20/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7934658 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Diana Vara, Amanda Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Sheet)(Connor, Eileen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vara et al v. Devos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elisabeth Devos
Represented By: Annapurna Balakrishna
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Represented By: Annapurna Balakrishna
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Wilson
Represented By: Eileen M. Connor
Represented By: Kyra A. Taylor
Represented By: Toby Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Vara
Represented By: Eileen M. Connor
Represented By: Kyra A. Taylor
Represented By: Toby Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?