COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS v. U.S. Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Defendant: Elisabeth Devos and U.S. Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2019cv12177
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 1/13/2020 (Simeone, Maria)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/13/20 to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Elisabeth Devos, U.S. Department of Education.(Balakrishna, Annapurna)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Annapurna Balakrishna on behalf of Elisabeth Devos, U.S. Department of Education (Balakrishna, Annapurna)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of Elisabeth Devos, U.S. Department of Education (Johnson, Anita)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. The court will convene a combined Status Conference in Commonwealth v. U.S. Department of Education et. al. Civil Action 19cv12177 and Vara v. DeVos et. al. 19cv12175 on 1/6/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-12175-LTS, 1:19-cv-12177-LTS(Montes, Mariliz)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Hooley, Diana)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana K. Hooley on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS (Hooley, Diana)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7934855 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Category Form)(Shavit, Yael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS v. U.S. Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Diana K. Hooley
Represented By: Yael Shavit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elisabeth Devos
Represented By: Annapurna Balakrishna
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Education
Represented By: Annapurna Balakrishna
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?