Goldman V. COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC
Plaintiff: Justin Goldman
Defendant: COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv12180
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 Electronic notice to counsel: This civil action has been transferred to the Southern District of New York and assigned civil case number 1:19-cv-11060. (Danieli, Chris)
November 29, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred to Southern District of New York;. Original file with documents numbered all documents, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Halley, Taylor)
November 29, 2019 Filing 7 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Consent MOTION to Change Venue by COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC. (Halley, Taylor) (Halley, Taylor).
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Change Venue by COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC.(Caplan, David)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David K. Caplan on behalf of COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC (Caplan, David)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Norwick, Kenneth)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7935389 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Justin Goldman.(Norwick, Kenneth) #1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Form) Modified on 10/22/2019 to separate attachments into proper docket text (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldman V. COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COX MEDIA GROUP NORTHEAST, LLC
Represented By: David K. Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Goldman
Represented By: Kenneth P. Norwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?