ecobee, Inc. v. 1ST AVENUE SUPERSTORE et al
Plaintiff: ecobee, Inc.
Defendant: 1ST AVENUE SUPERSTORE, DIRECT SALES and KENTUCKY HOME
Case Number: 1:2019cv12185
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. PERMANENT INJUNCTION (Halley, Taylor) (Main Document 13 replaced on 12/19/2019) (Halley, Taylor).
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Default Judgment. Defendants 1st Avenue Superstore, Kentucky Home, and Direct Sales having failed to plead or otherwise defend in this action and their defaults having been entered; and upon application of plaintiff ecobee, Inc. and affidavits demonstrating that defendants are not infants or an incompetent person or in the military service of the United States; and, taking all of plaintiffs' well-pleaded factual allegations as true, it has shown injunctive relief is warranted; it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that a permanent injunction, the terms of which shall issue separately today, shall enter against defendants. (Halley, Taylor)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to 1st Avenue Superstore, Kentucky Home, and Direct Sales by ecobee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nickerson, Morgan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment (Halley, Taylor)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to 1st Avenue SuperStore, Direct Sales, Kentucky Home (Halley, Taylor)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 Request for notice of default by ecobee, Inc. . (Nickerson, Morgan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by ecobee, Inc.. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by ecobee, Inc.. (Nickerson, Morgan)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: "Motion GRANTED." ORDER entered granting #5 Motion. (Bono, Christine)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS by ecobee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Order, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Order, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Order)(Nickerson, Morgan)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7935939 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by ecobee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Form AO120)(Nickerson, Morgan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ecobee, Inc. v. 1ST AVENUE SUPERSTORE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1ST AVENUE SUPERSTORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECT SALES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENTUCKY HOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ecobee, Inc.
Represented By: Morgan T. Nickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?