Chiminello v. Dynia & Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: David Chiminello
Defendant: Dynia & Associates, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv12188
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Referring Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The court adopts the #14 proposed schedule of the parties and cancels the Scheduling conference set for 12/17/19. Initial disclosures by 12/31/19. No amendments anticipated. Fact discovery complete by 9/15/20. Dispositive motions by 10/15/20. A status conference has been set for 6/1/20 at 2:15pm. re #14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting ( Status Conference set for 6/1/2020 02:15 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin.) (Simeone, Maria)
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela K. Troccoli on behalf of David Chiminello (Troccoli, Angela)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kimmel, Craig)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (O'Connor, John)
December 3, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by David Chiminello.(Kimmel, Craig)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling Conference has been set for 12/17/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling order sample, #2 standing order on summary judgment)(Simeone, Maria)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Kimmel, Craig)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dynia & Associates, LLC. (O'Connor, John)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Dynia & Associates, LLC.(O'Connor, John)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC REMINDER TO COUNSEL: A notification form indicating whether or not the parties have consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge has not been filed. Submission of the form is mandatory and a completed form should be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Dynia & Associates, LLC.(O'Connor, John)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Dynia & Associates, LLC served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Kimmel, Craig)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dynia & Associates, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dynia & Associates, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7936592 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by David Chiminello. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category W-9 Form, #3 Summons)(Kimmel, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chiminello v. Dynia & Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynia & Associates, LLC
Represented By: John J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Chiminello
Represented By: Craig Thor Kimmel
Represented By: Angela K. Troccoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?