Gould v. Mitchell et al
Petitioner: David Gould
Respondent: Lisa Mitchell and Maura Healy
Case Number: 1:2019cv12227
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered 1.The Motion to Hold Habeas Corpus in Abeyance [#1] is denied without prejudice. 2.The Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees [#2] is denied without prejudice. If Petitioner files a Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, he should submit an updated Application. 3.The Clerk is directed to send Petitioner a blank Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus (AO 241) and a blank Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees (AO 240). 4.If Petitioner does not file his Petition by April 8, 2020, the Clerk shall enter a final order of dismissal. (PSSA, 4) Modified on 12/30/2019 (PSSA, 4). (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/30/2019) (PSSA, 4).
December 24, 2019 Filing 5 Copy of docket sheet mailed to Pro Se Petitioner David Gould on December 24, 2019 re #4 Letter/request (non-motion) of Status Update on case. (Kelly, Danielle)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 Letter/request (non-motion) regarding Status Update from Pro Se Petitioner David Gould. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Gould.(Castilla, Francis)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254, filed by Maura Healy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gould v. Mitchell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lisa Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Maura Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?