Brooks v. Citizens Bank of Massachusetts
Plaintiff: Melissa Brooks
Defendant: Citizens Bank of Massachusetts
Case Number: 1:2019cv12231
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 by Richard C. Cunha on behalf of Melissa Brooks. (Cunha, Richard)
December 17, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Amend by Melissa Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Cunha, Richard)
December 16, 2019 Filing 20 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to include the certificate of conferral required by the Local Rules. re #18 Motion to Amend (Simeone, Maria)
December 16, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Melissa Brooks . (Cunha, Richard)
December 16, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend by Melissa Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Cunha, Richard)
December 16, 2019 Filing 17 Opposition re #14 MOTION to Amend filed by Melissa Brooks. (Cunha, Richard)
December 13, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Melissa Brooks . (Cunha, Richard)
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 Opposition re #14 MOTION to Amend filed by Melissa Brooks. (Cunha, Richard)
December 13, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend by Melissa Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Cunha, Richard)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 12/13/2019 (Simeone, Maria)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time 10 12/13/19 to file objection to motion to dismiss. (Simeone, Maria)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to December 13, 2019 to File Objection to Motion to Dismiss by Melissa Brooks. (Attachments: #1 certificate of Service)(Cunha, Richard)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record (Montes, Mariliz)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 11/29/2019 (Montes, Mariliz)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Plaintiff's Assented-To Motion for Extension of Time to file opposition to #5 motion to dismiss. Opposition due by 11/29/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Continue Time to Object To Motion to Dismiss to November 29, 2019 by Melissa Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Extend Time)(Cunha, Richard)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Citizens Bank of Massachusetts. (Pastore, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Citizens Bank of Massachusetts.(Pastore, Michael)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Warnock, Douglas)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Citizens Bank of Massachusetts. (Pastore, Michael)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Citizens Bank of Massachusetts ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7945546 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Pastore, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Citizens Bank of Massachusetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Bank of Massachusetts
Represented By: Michael E. Pastore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Brooks
Represented By: Richard C. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?