The Standard Fire Insurance Company v. Midea America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: The Standard Fire Insurance Company as Subrogee of Pearl Legan and The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products Inc and Midea America Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv12254
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Electrolux Home Products Inc served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Cheung-Truslow, Marie)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Standard Fire Insurance Company. Midea America Corporation served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Cheung-Truslow, Marie) Corrected duplicate docket text & duplicate event types (Kelly, Danielle).
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7952669 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by The Standard Fire Insurance Company as Subrogee of Pearl Legan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 JS45 Category Sheet)(Cheung-Truslow, Marie) Modified on 11/4/2019 to fix docket text, and parties selection (Vieira, Leonardo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Standard Fire Insurance Company v. Midea America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Standard Fire Insurance Company as Subrogee of Pearl Legan
Represented By: Marie Cheung-Truslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Marie Cheung-Truslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midea America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?