Lee v. Howard Hughes Medical Institute
Plaintiff: Jeannie T. Lee
Defendant: Howard Hughes Medical Institute
Case Number: 1:2019cv12289
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 18 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) filed by Jeannie T. Lee. (Weliky, James)
December 17, 2019 Filing 17 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #16 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) by Jeannie T. Lee. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Weliky, James)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 STATE COURT Record. (Webb, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) filed by Howard Hughes Medical Institute. (Webb, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #12 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to HHMI's Partial Motion to Dismiss by Howard Hughes Medical Institute.(Webb, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) filed by Jeannie T. Lee. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Weliky, James)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Weliky on behalf of Jeannie T. Lee (Weliky, James)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron G. Gingrande on behalf of Howard Hughes Medical Institute (Gingrande, Aaron)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenny K. Cooper on behalf of Howard Hughes Medical Institute (Cooper, Jenny)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) filed by Howard Hughes Medical Institute. (Webb, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) by Howard Hughes Medical Institute.(Webb, Jeffrey)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Kelly, Danielle)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Howard Hughes Medical Institute. (Webb, Jeffrey)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Howard Hughes Medical Institute. (Gingrande, Aaron)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Howard Hughes Medical Institute ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7960145 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Webb, Jeffrey) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/7/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2019: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Howard Hughes Medical Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Hughes Medical Institute
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Webb
Represented By: Aaron G. Gingrande
Represented By: Jenny K. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie T. Lee
Represented By: Dahlia C. Rudavsky
Represented By: James S. Weliky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?