Doe, et. al. v. Newton Public Schools, et. al.
Plaintiff: David Doe, Jane Doe and John Doe
Defendant: Bureau of Special Education Appeals and Newton Public Schools
Case Number: 1:2019cv12293
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Referring Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 21 First CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Lightfoot, Laronica)
December 31, 2019 Filing 20 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Hagerty, Eileen)
December 26, 2019 Filing 19 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.(Lara, Miguel)
December 23, 2019 Filing 18 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 23, 2019 to File Answer by Bureau of Special Education Appeals.(Lightfoot, Laronica)
December 23, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bureau of Special Education Appeals.(Lightfoot, Laronica)
December 16, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Laronica K. Lightfoot on behalf of Bureau of Special Education Appeals (Lightfoot, Laronica)
December 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CORRECTION TO DOCKET MADE BY COURT STAFF. Correction: Dkt. Nos 11 and 12 corrected because: The incorrect event was used to docket return of summons. Each summons has been re-docketed correctly. Dkt. Nos 11 and 12 should be disregarded in its entirety. Counsel is reminded to review local rules and the attorney handbook when filing documents with the Court. (Lara, Miguel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Bureau of Special Education Appeals served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Lara, Miguel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Newton Public Schools served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Lara, Miguel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 DISREGARD: Notice of Service of Process filed by David Doe, John Doe, Jane Doe. Individual(s)/Entities served: Newton Public Schools. (Hagerty, Eileen) Modified on 12/12/2019 (Lara, Miguel).
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 DISREGARD: Notice of Service of Process filed by David Doe, John Doe, Jane Doe. Individual(s)/Entities served: Massachusetts Division of Administrative Law Appeals. (Hagerty, Eileen) Modified on 12/12/2019 (Lara, Miguel).
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn A. Weisman on behalf of Newton Public Schools (Weisman, Carolyn)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference.... Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Newton Public Schools.(Murray, Jill)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lara, Miguel)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris added. Judge Allison D. Burroughs no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Folan, Karen)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bureau of Special Education Appeals, Newton Public Schools. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Anonymously and to Seal Record by David Doe, John Doe, Jane Doe.(Hagerty, Eileen)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Newton Public Schools and Bureau of Special Education of Appeals Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7961101 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by John Doe, David Doe, Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit A to Complaint)(Hagerty, Eileen) Modified on 11/7/2019 to correct docket text(Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe, et. al. v. Newton Public Schools, et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Doe
Represented By: Eileen M. Hagerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Eileen M. Hagerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Eileen M. Hagerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Special Education Appeals
Represented By: Laronica K. Lightfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newton Public Schools
Represented By: Jill M. Murray
Represented By: Carolyn A. Weisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?