Selective Insurance Co., et al v. Steadfast Insurance Co., et al
Plaintiff: Selective Insurance Company of America and Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Interested Party: Robert Lavanga, Shannon Thomas-George, Bethany Community Services, Inc., Nancy Walsh and Sarah's Place Adult Day Health Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv12294
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC REMINDER TO COUNSEL: A notification form indicating whether or not the parties have consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge has not been filed. Submission of the form is mandatory and a completed form should be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Steadfast Insurance Company.(Rose, Lincoln)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lincoln A. Rose on behalf of Steadfast Insurance Company (Rose, Lincoln)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint. Defendant's answer due 12/27/2019. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to December 27, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Steadfast Insurance Company.(Smith, Tamara)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Steadfast Insurance Company served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (O'Donnell, Barbara)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (O'Donnell, Barbara)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7961271 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit 1st Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Sarah's Place Service Agreement, #5 Exhibit Zurich Ins. Policy, #6 Exhibit Selective Ins. Policy, #7 Exhibit Selective 6-9-17 Disclaimer, #8 Exhibit Steadfast 6-12-17 Email Disclaimer, #9 Exhibit Selective 6-27-17 Disclaimer, #10 6-20-17 Selective ROR re Sarah's Place, #11 Steadfast 4-12-18 Supplemental Disclaimer, #12 Selective 6-14-18 to Sarah's Place, #13 Selective 9-20-18 ROR to Robert Lavanga, #14 9/24/19 Ltr to Steadfast re Sarah's Place)(O'Donnell, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selective Insurance Co., et al v. Steadfast Insurance Co., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Robert Lavanga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shannon Thomas-George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bethany Community Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nancy Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sarah's Place Adult Day Health Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selective Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Barbara A. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast
Represented By: Barbara A. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Tamara J. Smith
Represented By: Lincoln A. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?