Borden v. Sexton et al
Plaintiff: Jason Dean Borden
Defendant: Sexton, Federal Bureau of Prisons, United States of America and Federal Bureau Industries
Case Number: 1:2019cv12306
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jason Dean Borden. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 27, 2019 Filing 29 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #20 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis On November 12, 2019, Jason Borden was Ordered to either pay the $400 filing and administrative fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically addressing his three strikes status. On December 3, 2019, Borden filed, among other things, a motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 20) and a response addressing his three-strikes status under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) (ECF No. 23). Borden claims, among other things, that (1) he received judgments in his favor on those cases, (2) the other cases did not deal with the subject matter in this action, (3) he was not required to pay a fee in all of those cases, (4) he need not pay a filing fee based upon the nature of the action. Other than Bordens assertions, he has not demonstrated that the actions identified in the November 12, 2019 Order do not bar in forma pauperis status under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Bordens remaining arguments are unmeritorious. Finally, Borden has not demonstrated that at the time of the filing of this action he was under imminent danger of serious physical injury. 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Accordingly, the motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 20) is hereby DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Borden shall pay the $400 filing fee by January 17, 2020. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of this action. (PSSA, 5) Modified on 12/27/2019 (PSSA, 5).
December 20, 2019 Filing 28 Letter/request (non-motion) from Jason Dean Borden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Vieira, Leonardo)
December 18, 2019 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
December 4, 2019 Filing 26 Letter/request (non-motion) from Jason Dean Borden. (Belmont, Kellyann)
December 4, 2019 Filing 25 Copy of #14 Plaintiff's first set of Interrogatories to Defendants by Jason Dean Borden. (Belmont, Kellyann)
December 3, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of filing duplicate of #13 MOTION for Leave to File an actual Federal Civil Lawsuit pursuant to the denied claims of injury TORT request from safety Ashland FCI, issued second to Regional Counsel- Northeastern District, (BOP), (FPI),(Unicor),(U.S. of A.). filed by Jason Dean Borden. (Belmont, Kellyann)
December 3, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Proceed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) is considered moot in (PREA) with injury. (3-Strikes) filed by Jason Dean Borden.(Belmont, Kellyann)
December 3, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of filing Plaintiff's First Requests for production of documents Fed R. Civ. Proc. 26(b)(1) relevant to PREA and/or other/any filed by Jason Dean Borden (Belmont, Kellyann)
December 3, 2019 Filing 21 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Jason Dean Borden. Document received: Proposed Order re #9 Motion for Leave to appointment of Guardian ad Litem. (Belmont, Kellyann)
December 3, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jason Dean Borden.(Belmont, Kellyann)
December 3, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appoint Legal Counsel pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Incompetence, Disabled) filed by Jason Dean Borden. (Attachments: #1 Apendix A)(Belmont, Kellyann)
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave for the contents of FOIA Request #2020 00757 be entered into USDC Docket record herin for cause to preoceed in forma puaperis, cause to Appoint Legal counsel. Cause for leave to file criminal complaint filed by Jason Dean Borden.(Belmont, Kellyann)
November 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of filing Certificate of Inmate Account by Jason Dean Borden (Belmont, Kellyann)
November 21, 2019 Filing 16 Plaintiff's First Requests for production of documents Fed.R.Civ.Proc. (26)(b)(1) relevat to PREA and/or other/any filed by Jason Dean Borden (Belmont, Kellyann)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 Letter/request (non-motion) from Jason Dean Borden. (Belmont, Kellyann)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 Plaintiff's first set of Interrogatories to Defendants filed by Jason Dean Borden (Belmont, Kellyann)
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File an actual Federal Civil Lawsuit pursuant to the denied claims of injury TORT request from safety Ashland FCI, issued second to Regional Counsel- Northeastern District, (BOP), (FPI),(Unicor),(U.S. of A.). filed by Jason Dean Borden. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(Belmont, Kellyann)
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to proceed. Motion for 180 day Extension of Time to file Federal Lawsuit pursuant to Rules of Civil Procedure of TORT filed by Jason Dean Borden.(Belmont, Kellyann)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for leave requesting a De Novo Review Three Judge Panel and Change of Venue filed by Jason Dean Borden.(Belmont, Kellyann)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 Letter/request (non-motion) from Jason Dean Borden. (Belmont, Kellyann)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave Appointment of Guardian ad Litem pursuant to the Americans with Disabilities Act filed by Jason Dean Borden.(Belmont, Kellyann)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 Letter/request (non-motion) filed by Nancy D. (Belmont, Kellyann)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Letter/request (non-motion) from Jason Dean Borden. (Belmont, Kellyann)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered. (PSSA, 5)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Motion for 180 day Extension to File Federal Lawsuit Pursuant to Rules of Civil Procedure of Tort by Jason Dean Borden.(Castilla, Francis)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Object Order dated October 7, 2019 signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit Jr by Jason Dean Borden.(Castilla, Francis)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave requesting a De Novo Review Three Judge Panel and Change Venue by Jason Dean Borden.(Castilla, Francis)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jason Dean Borden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borden v. Sexton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Dean Borden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?