Barbas v. PHH Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: Joanne C. Barbas
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation and Ocwen
Case Number: 1:2019cv12319
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: ALLOWING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Plaintiff shall file response to the motion to dismiss no later than January 24, 2020. (Kelly, Danielle)
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 EXHIBIT A re #13 to Extend Time to File Response as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Joanne C. Barbas. (Kelly, Danielle)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Extend Time to File Response as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Joanne C. Barbas. (Kelly, Danielle)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 STATE COURT Record. (Durant, Robert). Modified on 12/4/2019: Replaced document due to correct page alignment(Kelly, Danielle).
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 Copy of NEF #9 Electronic Order Allowing #8 , NEF #10 Deadline Reset and copy of docket mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff on November 26, 2019. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Response due by 12/18/2019 (Kelly, Danielle)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #8 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. The time for Plaintiff to file any opposition or response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #6 is extended to December 18, 2019. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to December 18, 2019 to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Sprague, Stephanie)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Memo ISO MTD)(Sprague, Stephanie)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Sprague, Stephanie)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel (Robert James Durant) by mail. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Sprague on behalf of Ocwen/PHH/New Rez (Sprague, Stephanie)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ocwen/PHH/New Rez identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent PHH Corporation for Ocwen/PHH/New Rez.. (Durant, Robert)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ocwen/PHH/New Rez ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7965867 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #5 Exhibit C - 2006 Assignment, #6 Exhibit D - 2015 Assignment, #7 Exhibit E - Quitclaim Deed, #8 Exhibit F - Property Card)(Durant, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbas v. PHH Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Stephanie Sprague
Represented By: Robert James Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen
Represented By: Stephanie Sprague
Represented By: Robert James Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne C. Barbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?