Blue Sky Towers II, LLC v. Town of Mashpee et al
Plaintiff: Blue Sky Towers II, LLC d/b/a BSTMA II, LLC and Blue Sky Towers II, LLC
Defendant: Town of Mashpee Planning Board, Joseph Cummings, John Phelan, Town of Mashpee, Joseph Callahan, Mary Waygan and Dennis Balzarini
Case Number: 1:2019cv12333
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 14 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(adminn, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT (Zierk, Marsha)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 AGREEMENT FOR JUDGMENT (Assented) by Dennis Balzarini, Joseph Callahan, Joseph Cummings, John Phelan, Town of Mashpee, Town of Mashpee Planning Board, Mary Waygan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Costello, Patrick)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Costello on behalf of Dennis Balzarini, Joseph Callahan, Joseph Cummings, John Phelan, Town of Mashpee, Town of Mashpee Planning Board, Mary Waygan (Costello, Patrick)
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Joseph Callahan served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Duval, Earl)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Dennis Balzarini served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Duval, Earl)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Joseph Cummings served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Duval, Earl)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed John Phelan served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Duval, Earl)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Mary Waygan served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Duval, Earl)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Town of Mashpee Planning Board served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Duval, Earl)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Town of Mashpee served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Duval, Earl)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dennis Balzarini, Joseph Callahan, Joseph Cummings, John Phelan, Town of Mashpee, Town of Mashpee Planning Board, Mary Waygan. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7968224 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Blue Sky Towers II, LLC d/b/a BSTMA II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Duval, Earl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Sky Towers II, LLC v. Town of Mashpee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Mashpee Planning Board
Represented By: Patrick J. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Cummings
Represented By: Patrick J. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Phelan
Represented By: Patrick J. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Mashpee
Represented By: Patrick J. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Callahan
Represented By: Patrick J. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Waygan
Represented By: Patrick J. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Balzarini
Represented By: Patrick J. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Sky Towers II, LLC d/b/a BSTMA II, LLC
Represented By: Earl W. Duval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Sky Towers II, LLC
Represented By: Earl W. Duval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?